EP4274998 - HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE INCLUDING REFLECTIVE DOOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.07.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | 08.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2023/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIBSON, John Pollocksville, North Carolina 28573 / US | 02 /
JONES, Kenneth Washington, North Carolina 27889 / US | 03 /
PARCHMAN, Robert Newport, North Carolina 28570 / US | [2023/46] | Application number, filing date | 21839020.1 | 08.12.2021 | [2023/46] | WO2021EP84779 | Priority number, date | US202117142282 | 06.01.2021 Original published format: US202117142282 | [2023/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022148591 | Date: | 14.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4274998 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F24C7/08, F24C15/00, F24C15/04 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
F24C7/085 (EP,US);
F27D21/02 (US);
F24C15/008 (US);
F24C15/04 (EP,US);
F27D1/0033 (US);
F24C15/005 (EP,US);
F27D2021/026 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/46] | Title | German: | HAUSHALTSGERÄT MIT REFLEKTIERENDER TÜR | [2023/46] | English: | HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE INCLUDING REFLECTIVE DOOR | [2023/46] | French: | APPAREIL MÉNAGER DOTÉ DE PORTE RÉFLÉCHISSANTE | [2023/46] | Entry into regional phase | 07.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 07.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/46] | 07.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP2000220845 (SHARP KK) [Y] 5,6,12,13,20 * paragraphs [0004] , [0072] - [0074]; figure - *; | [Y]US2003066825 (LEUTNER KURT [DE], et al) [Y] 3-6,10-13,17-20 * paragraphs [0045] , [0051] , [0055] , [0066]; figures 1,7,8,12 *; | [XAYI]EP2444735 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 8,9,15,16 * paragraphs [0015] , [ 0019] , [ 0025]; figure - * [A] 7,14 [Y] 3-6,10-13,17-20 [I] 1,2; | [A]WO2020074475 (BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH [DE])[A] 1; | [A]EP3667173 (ELECTROLUX APPLIANCES AB [SE]) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0043] * |