EP4267380 - EYEGLASS LENS WITH DECORATIVE ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | 01.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Luxottica S.r.l. Via Valcozzena, 10 32021 Agordo (Belluno) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2023/44] | For all designated states Luxottica S.r.l. Via Valcozzena, 10 32021 Agordo, (Belluno) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPREMULLI, Vincenzo 10099 San Mauro Torinese (TO) / IT | 02 /
GUAGLIUMI, Cristina 20851 Lissone (MB) / IT | [2023/44] | Representative(s) | Iannone, Carlo Luigi, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | [2023/44] | Application number, filing date | 21839272.8 | 21.12.2021 | [2023/44] | WO2021IB62098 | Priority number, date | IT20200032372 | 24.12.2020 Original published format: IT202000032372 | [2023/44] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022137113 | Date: | 30.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4267380 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B29D11/00, G02C7/02 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
G02C7/021 (EP,US);
B29D11/00009 (EP);
B29D11/00317 (EP);
B29D11/0073 (EP);
B29D11/00817 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/44] | Title | German: | BRILLENGLAS MIT DEKORATIVEM ELEMENT | [2023/44] | English: | EYEGLASS LENS WITH DECORATIVE ELEMENT | [2023/44] | French: | VERRE DE LUNETTES COMPORTANT UN ÉLÉMENT DÉCORATIF | [2023/44] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/44] | 23.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2004084790 (BLUM RONALD D [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0051] *; | [A]US2007109493 (CLERC DIDIER [FR]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [Y]US2015183173 (LINHARDT JEFFREY GEORGE [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0117] - paragraph [0120] * * paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0107] - paragraph [0110] * * paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0137] *; | [Y]EP2930013 (INTERGLASS TECHNOLOGY AG [CH]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0003] *; | [A]US2017368723 (FÄECKE THOMAS [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2018003973 (WADE ANDREW G [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0062] *; | [A]WO2020064879 (INTERGLASS TECH AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |