EP4260005 - DISTANCE MEASUREMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | 16.02.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokra Optische Prüftechnik und Automation GmbH Max-Planck-Str. 12 52499 Baesweiler / DE | [2023/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HELLMANN, Christian 52146 Würselen / DE | [2023/42] | Representative(s) | Schwenderling, Jens KEENWAY Patentanwälte Neumann Heine Taruttis PartG mbB Postfach 103363 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | [2023/42] | Application number, filing date | 21839382.5 | 13.12.2021 | [2023/42] | WO2021EP85422 | Priority number, date | DE202010133404 | 14.12.2020 Original published format: DE102020133404 | [2023/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022128879 | Date: | 23.06.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4260005 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/02, B21B38/04, G01B11/06 | [2023/42] | CPC: |
G01B11/0691 (EP);
G01B11/026 (EP);
B21B38/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/42] | Title | German: | ABSTANDSMESSUNG | [2023/42] | English: | DISTANCE MEASUREMENT | [2023/42] | French: | MESURE DE DISTANCE | [2023/42] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/42] | 10.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]EP0486713 (KUGELFISCHER G SCHAEFER & CO [DE]) [I] 1-10 * column 2, line 23 - column 3, line 4; figure 1 *; | [A]DE10060144 (DILLINGER HUETTENWERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0024] - [0038]; figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0051]; figure 8 *; | [A]DE102013017289 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1-10* paragraphs [0045] - [0053]; figures 1-2 * |