EP4268350 - WIRELESS POWER TRANSFER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | 23.02.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2023/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DRAAK, Johannes, Wilhelmus 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
ETTES, Wilhelmus, Gerardus, Maria 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
LULOFS, Klaas, Jakob 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2023/44] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2023/44] | Application number, filing date | 21839457.5 | 15.12.2021 | [2023/44] | WO2021EP85814 | Priority number, date | EP20200216484 | 22.12.2020 Original published format: EP 20216484 | [2023/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022136042 | Date: | 30.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4268350 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02J50/12 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
H02J50/12 (EP,KR,US);
G01R23/07 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/44] | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSE STROMÜBERTRAGUNG | [2023/44] | English: | WIRELESS POWER TRANSFER | [2023/44] | French: | TRANSFERT D'ÉNERGIE SANS FIL | [2023/44] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/44] | 24.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2013134795 (KANNO HIROSHI [JP]) [A] 1,11,14 * figures 11, 17-21 * * paragraph [0132] *; | [I]EP2950415 (PANASONIC IP MAN CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1-14 * figures 2,3, 4A, 4B, 11, 12, 13 * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0094] - paragraph [0109] *; | [A]WO2018163170 (POWERMAT TECH LTD [IL]) [A] 1,11,14* figure 4 * | by applicant | EP2940415 |