EP4263902 - METHOD FOR ETCHING AT LEAST ONE SURFACE OF A PLASTIC SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | 23.02.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Atotech Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Erasmusstraße 20 10553 Berlin / DE | [2024/02] |
Former [2023/43] | For all designated states Atotech Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Erasmusstraße 20 10553 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SZAMOCKI, Rafael-Eduard 10553 Berlin / DE | 02 /
FINN, Franziska 10553 Berlin / DE | 03 /
FELS, Carl Christian 10553 Berlin / DE | [2023/43] | Representative(s) | MKS IP Association Intellectual Property Erasmusstraße 20 10553 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/43] | Atotech Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Intellectual Property Erasmusstraße 20 10553 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 21839534.1 | 17.12.2021 | [2023/43] | WO2021EP86440 | Priority number, date | EP20200215535 | 18.12.2020 Original published format: EP 20215535 | [2023/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022129492 | Date: | 23.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4263902 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C23C18/24, C23C18/16, C23C18/20, C25B1/21 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
C23C18/24 (EP,KR,US);
C08J7/00 (KR);
C23C18/1641 (US);
C23C18/1651 (US);
C23C18/1653 (EP,KR,US);
C23C18/2086 (EP,KR,US);
C23C18/32 (KR);
C23C18/38 (KR);
C23C28/02 (KR);
C23C28/023 (US);
C25B1/21 (EP,KR);
C25D3/12 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/43] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ÄTZEN MINDESTENS EINER OBERFLÄCHE EINES KUNSTSTOFFSUBSTRATS | [2023/43] | English: | METHOD FOR ETCHING AT LEAST ONE SURFACE OF A PLASTIC SUBSTRATE | [2023/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE GRAVURE D'AU MOINS UNE SURFACE D'UN SUBSTRAT EN PLASTIQUE | [2023/43] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/43] | 18.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XDYI]US3647699 (DOTY WARREN R, et al) [XD] 1,3,6-13,15 * abstract * * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 2 * * column 4, line 56 - column 5, line 20 * [Y] 4 [I] 5; | [X]EP1001052 (LPW CHEMIE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,6-11,14 * paragraph [0009]; claim 1 * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0025] *; | [Y]US8603352 (ZHANG-BEGLINGER WAN [CH], et al) [Y] 4* column 1, lines 28-58 * | by applicant | US3647699 | EP1001052 | EP2025708 | US9023228 |