EP4281409 - METHOD TO CONTROL SYNGAS COMPOSITION BY REACTOR TEMPERATURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.07.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Praxair Technology, Inc. 10 Riverview Drive Danbury, CT 06810 / US | [2023/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAMSTEDT, Bradley, D. Williamsville, NY 14221 / US | 02 /
BOOL, Lawrence, E. East Aurora, NY 14052 / US | [2023/48] | Representative(s) | Schwan Schorer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Bauerstraße 22 80796 München / DE | [2023/48] | Application number, filing date | 21840260.0 | 08.12.2021 | [2023/48] | WO2021US62310 | Priority number, date | US202163141049P | 25.01.2021 Original published format: US 202163141049 P | [2023/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022159188 | Date: | 28.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4281409 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C01B3/36 | [2023/48] | CPC: |
C01B3/36 (EP,KR,US);
C01B3/48 (US);
C01B2203/0216 (EP,KR);
C01B2203/0255 (US);
C01B2203/0283 (EP,KR,US);
C01B2203/0465 (EP,KR);
C01B2203/0475 (EP,KR);
C01B2203/0485 (EP,KR);
C01B2203/062 (EP,KR);
C01B2203/0861 (EP,KR);
C01B2203/1241 (US);
C01B2203/148 (US);
C10J2300/0916 (US);
C10J2300/0989 (EP,KR);
C10J2300/1656 (US);
C10J2300/1823 (EP,KR);
C10J2300/1846 (EP,KR);
C10J3/72 (US);
Y02E60/30 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/48] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINER SYNGASZUSAMMENSETZUNG DURCH REAKTORTEMPERATUR | [2023/48] | English: | METHOD TO CONTROL SYNGAS COMPOSITION BY REACTOR TEMPERATURE | [2023/48] | French: | MÉTHODE DE RÉGULATION DE COMPOSITION DE GAZ DE SYNTHÈSE PAR LA TEMPÉRATURE DE RÉACTEUR | [2023/48] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/48] | 22.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/32] | 04.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2024/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US2012023822 (D AGOSTINI MARK DANIEL [US], et al); | [XA]US2016176793 (CHAKRAVARTI SHRIKAR [US], et al); | [XA]US2017320730 (MAMEDOV AGHADDIN [US]) | by applicant | US5266024 |