EP4259099 - BIOLOGICAL DELIVERY SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Particella, Inc. 455 Mission Bay Blvd S. San Francisco, CA 94518 / US | [2023/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AHMAD, Mubhij Walnut Creek, California 94598 / US | 02 /
DAY, Timothy Oakland, California 94606 / US | 03 /
HAFEZ, Ismail Concord, California 94518 / US | 04 /
MERRITT, John San Mateo, California 94401 / US | [2023/42] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2023/42] | Application number, filing date | 21840333.5 | 14.12.2021 | [2023/42] | WO2021US63182 | Priority number, date | US202063125075P | 14.12.2020 Original published format: US 202063125075 P | US202163194315P | 28.05.2021 Original published format: US 202163194315 P | WO2021US37011 | 11.06.2021 Original published format: PCT/US2021/037011 | US202163282421P | 23.11.2021 Original published format: US 202163282421 P | [2023/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022132678 | Date: | 23.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4259099 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K9/127, A61K9/107, A61P1/00, A61K39/00, A61K39/385, C12N15/00, C12Q1/00 | [2023/42] | CPC: |
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61K47/544 (US);
A61K47/10 (US);
A61K47/28 (US);
A61K47/543 (US);
A61K47/64 (US);
A61K47/6929 (US);
A61K9/0031 (EP);
A61K9/1075 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/42] | Title | German: | BIOLOGISCHE ABGABESYSTEME | [2023/42] | English: | BIOLOGICAL DELIVERY SYSTEMS | [2023/42] | French: | SYSTÈMES DE DISTRIBUTION DE PRODUITS BIOLOGIQUES | [2023/42] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/42] | 03.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XP]CA3142949 (DNALITE THERAPEUTICS INC [US]); | [XP]WO2021119585 (DNALITE THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al); | [XP]US2021346306 (DIMITROV STOIL [US], et al); | by applicant | WO2019222400 | US2020129431 | WO2017US61111 | WO2019US32484 |