EP4262868 - ANTI-IL5R ANTIBODY FORMULATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Astrazeneca AB 151 85 Södertälje / SE | [2023/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GHAZVINI, Saba Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US | 02 /
MANKUS, Cassandra Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US | [2023/43] | Representative(s) | AstraZeneca Intellectual Property Eastbrook House Shaftesbury Road Cambridge CB2 8BF / GB | [2023/43] | Application number, filing date | 21840510.8 | 16.12.2021 | [2023/43] | WO2021EP86129 | Priority number, date | US202063199277P | 17.12.2020 Original published format: US 202063199277 P | [2023/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022129301 | Date: | 23.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4262868 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, A61K9/00, A61K47/18, A61K47/26, A61P1/04, A61P11/00, A61P11/06, A61P11/14, A61P37/08, C07K16/28, A61K39/00 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
A61K39/39591 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K47/10 (KR);
A61K47/12 (EP,IL);
A61K47/14 (IL,US);
A61K47/183 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K47/22 (IL,KR,US);
A61K47/26 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K47/34 (IL,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,IL);
A61K9/08 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K9/19 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P1/04 (EP,IL);
A61P11/00 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P11/06 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P11/14 (EP,IL);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/43] | Extension states | BA | 17.07.2023 | ME | 17.07.2023 | Validation states | MA | 17.07.2023 | TN | 17.07.2023 | Title | German: | ANTI-IL5R-ANTIKÖRPERFORMULIERUNGEN | [2023/43] | English: | ANTI-IL5R ANTIBODY FORMULATIONS | [2023/43] | French: | FORMULATIONS D'ANTICORPS ANTI-IL5R | [2023/43] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/43] | 17.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2015038925 (UNIV JEFFERSON [US]) [X] 1-4,34 * claim - * [I] 5-33,35-64; | [XI]WO2015061584 (MEDIMMUNE LLC [US]) [X] 1-4,34 * paragraph [0153] * [I] 5-33,35-64; | [XI]WO2018201064 (AMGEN INC [US]) [X] 1-4,34 * claim - * [I] 5-33,35-64; | [XI]WO2020160323 (ELEKTROFI INC [US]) [X] 1-4,34 * paragraph [0302] * * claim - * * paragraph [0126] * [I] 5-33,35-64; | [A] - DAUGHERTY A L ET AL, "Formulation and delivery issues for monoclonal antibody therapeutics", ADVANCED DRUG DELIVERY REVIEWS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM , NL, vol. 58, no. 5-6, doi:10.1016/J.ADDR.2006.03.011, ISSN 0169-409X, (20060807), pages 686 - 706, (20060807), XP024892149 [A] 1-64 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.addr.2006.03.011 | by applicant | US5545807 | US5591669 | US5939598 | US6018032 | US2010291073 | - SEYMOUR et al., Handbook of Molecular and Cellular Methods in Biology in Medicine, McGraw-Hill Book Company, (19950000), pages 33 - 41 | - CLACKSON et al., Nature, (19910000), vol. 352, pages 624 - 628 | - JAKOBOVITS et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19930000), vol. 90, page 2551 | - JAKOBOVITS et al., Nature, (19930000), vol. 362, pages 255 - 258 | - BRUGGERMANN et al., Year in Immunol, (19930000), vol. 7, page 33 | - MCCAFFERTY et al., Nature, (19900000), vol. 348, pages 552 - 554 | - MARKS et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19910000), vol. 222, pages 581 - 597 | - MARKS et al., Bio/Technology, (19920000), vol. 10, pages 779 - 783 | - WATERHOUSE et al., Nucl. Acids Res., (19930000), vol. 21, pages 2265 - 2266 | - "GenBank", Raven Press, Database accession no. M96652.1 |