EP3989388 - BATTERY APPARATUS, BATTERY MANAGEMENT SYSTEM, AND METHOD FOR CORRECTING MEASURED VOLTAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.03.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Energy Solution, Ltd. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | [2022/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Dong Hyeon Yuseong-gu, Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2022/17] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/17] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 21840767.4 | 01.07.2021 | [2022/17] | WO2021KR08323 | Priority number, date | KR20200089445 | 20.07.2020 Original published format: KR 20200089445 | [2022/17] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022019516 | Date: | 27.01.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3989388 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.01.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/3835, H02J7/00, H01M10/42, G06F1/30, H02J1/10, G06F1/28, G06F1/3212 | [2022/45] | CPC: |
G01R31/3835 (EP);
H02J7/0031 (EP,KR);
G01R31/385 (CN,US);
G06F1/305 (US);
G01R19/00 (CN);
G01R31/382 (KR);
G06F1/28 (EP);
G06F1/3212 (EP);
H01M10/425 (EP,US);
H01M10/48 (EP);
H02H7/18 (KR);
H02J1/108 (EP);
H02J7/0047 (KR,US);
H02J7/0063 (EP);
H01M2010/4271 (EP,KR,US);
H02J2207/10 (EP,US);
H02J2310/40 (EP);
H02J7/0034 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/17] | H02J7/00, H02H7/18, G01R31/382, H01M10/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/17] | Title | German: | BATTERIEVORRICHTUNG UND -VERWALTUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR KORREKTUR DER GEMESSENEN SPANNUNG | [2022/17] | English: | BATTERY APPARATUS, BATTERY MANAGEMENT SYSTEM, AND METHOD FOR CORRECTING MEASURED VOLTAGE | [2022/17] | French: | APPAREIL DE BATTERIE, SYSTÈME DE GESTION DE BATTERIE ET PROCÉDÉ DE CORRECTION DE TENSION MESURÉE | [2022/17] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2022 | Translation filed | 21.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 21.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/17] | 03.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6479968 (POZSGAY BRIAN THOMAS [US], et al); | [XI]US2009278508 (SANI ANDREA [IT], et al) | International search | [Y]KR100390362B ; | [A]US8949056 (YANG JONGWOON [KR], et al); | [YA]KR101700805B ; | [A]KR101856367B ; | [A]JP2019184387 (YAZAKI CORP) |