EP4271594 - SYSTEM COMPRISING A WIPER BLADE AND A WIPER ARM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.07.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2023/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TERENTIC, Andrija 11000 Belgrad / RS | 02 /
DEPONDT, Helmut 3370 Boutersem / BE | 03 /
RAPP, Harald 77815 Buehl / DE | 04 /
CAMPSTEYN, Matthew 3730 Hoeselt / BE | [2023/45] | Application number, filing date | 21840937.3 | 21.12.2021 | [2023/45] | WO2021EP86969 | Priority number, date | DE202010135168 | 31.12.2020 Original published format: DE102020135168 | DE202110206706 | 29.06.2021 Original published format: DE102021206706 | [2023/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022144229 | Date: | 07.07.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4271594 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/38, B60S1/52 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
B60S1/3805 (EP);
B60S1/3862 (EP);
B60S1/524 (EP);
B60S1/381 (EP);
B60S1/3856 (EP);
B60S1/3863 (EP);
B60S1/407 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/45] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UMFASSEND EIN WISCHBLATT UND EINEN WISCHARM | [2023/45] | English: | SYSTEM COMPRISING A WIPER BLADE AND A WIPER ARM | [2023/45] | French: | SYSTÈME COMPRENANT UNE LAME D'ESSUYAGE ET UN BRAS D'ESSUIE-GLACE | [2023/45] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/45] | 31.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/33] | 04.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2024/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]DE102019203145 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 11 * the whole document *[A] 1; | [XY]DE102019203686 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-3,9-11 * figure -; claims 1-8 * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0051] * [Y] 4-8; | [XA]DE102019203715 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 11 * the whole document * [A] 1; | [XAY]DE102019207610 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 11 * figure -; claims 1-6,9 * * paragraphs [0030] - [0053] * [A] 1 [Y] 4-8 | by applicant | US2014331437 |