EP4183869 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING MATURE ADIPOCYTE-CONTAINING COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.04.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | 26.07.2024 | Change - classification | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | 26.07.2024 | Change - classification | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medical Corporation Yanaga Clinic 1-2-12, Tenjin Chuo-ku Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 810-0001 / JP | [2023/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANAGA, Hiroko Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 810-0001 / JP | 02 /
YANAGA, Katsu Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 810-0001 / JP | [2023/21] | Representative(s) | van Dam, Vincent Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade B.V. Koninginnegracht 19 2514 AB Den Haag / NL | [2023/21] | Application number, filing date | 21841342.5 | 14.01.2021 | [2023/21] | WO2021JP01133 | Priority number, date | JP20200122512 | 17.07.2020 Original published format: JP 2020122512 | [2023/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022014071 | Date: | 20.01.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4183869 | Date: | 24.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.01.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/077, A61F2/06, A61F2/12, A61K35/35, A61P9/00, C12N5/0775 | [2024/35] | CPC: |
A61P9/00 (EP);
C12N5/0653 (EP,US);
A61K35/35 (EP);
C12M35/04 (US);
C12M37/02 (US);
C12N2501/115 (EP,US);
C12N2501/165 (EP);
C12N2501/21 (EP,US);
C12N2501/2306 (EP,US);
C12N2501/2308 (EP,US);
C12N2501/39 (EP,US);
C12N2502/1305 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/21] | C12N5/077, A61F2/06, A61F2/12, A61K35/35, A61P9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/21] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER REIFEN ADIPOZYTENHALTIGEN ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2023/21] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING MATURE ADIPOCYTE-CONTAINING COMPOSITION | [2023/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE COMPOSITION CONTENANT DES ADIPOCYTES MATURES | [2023/21] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2022 | Translation filed | 09.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2022 | Search fee paid | 09.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/21] | 12.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2005521405 ; | [A]JP2007507202 ; | [A]JP2014527821 ; | [A]JP2019514389 ; | [A]JP2019201640 (R BIO CO LTD, et al); | by applicant | JP2013018756 | JP5139294B | JP5526320B | JP5991687B |