EP4263338 - ELECTRONIC THROTTLE SYSTEM WITH LINEAR TRANSMISSION FOR MOTORCYCLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hirschmann Automotive GmbH Oberer Paspelsweg 6-8 6830 Rankweil/Brederis / AT | [2023/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÄHR, Dietmar 6822 Düns / AT | 02 /
PRIMOSCH, Michael 6800 Feldkirch / AT | 03 /
GROHS, Thomas 6774 Tschagguns / AT | [2023/43] | Representative(s) | Greif, Thomas Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Derendorfer Allee 6 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | [2023/43] | Application number, filing date | 21843598.0 | 17.12.2021 | [2023/43] | WO2021EP86523 | Priority number, date | DE202010133942 | 17.12.2020 Original published format: DE102020133942 | [2023/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022129546 | Date: | 23.06.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4263338 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B62K23/04, G01D5/20 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
B62K23/04 (EP,US);
G01D5/145 (EP);
G01D2205/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/43] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHES GASSYSTEM MIT EINER LINEARÜBERTRAGUNG FÜR MOTORRÄDER | [2023/43] | English: | ELECTRONIC THROTTLE SYSTEM WITH LINEAR TRANSMISSION FOR MOTORCYCLES | [2023/43] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE DES GAZ ÉLECTRONIQUE À TRANSFERT LINÉAIRE POUR MOTOCYCLETTES | [2023/43] | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/43] | 16.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/28] | 04.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]CN2592503Y (LU ZHAOSHAN [CN]) [X] 1-7 * abstract * [I] 8-10; | [X]JP2009227178 (MITSUBA CORP) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]CN112061280 (ZHEJIANG YITONG ELECTRONIC TECH CO LTD) [X] 1* abstract * | by applicant | EP1464571 |