EP4267750 - METHODS AND ENZYMES FOR PRODUCING QUILLAIC ACID DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | 01.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Plant Bioscience Limited Norwich Research Park Colney Lane Norwich, Norfolk NR4 7UH / GB | [2023/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSBOURN, Anne Norwich Norfolk NR4 7UH / GB | 02 /
REED, James Norwich Norfolk NR4 7UH / GB | 03 /
ORME, Anastasia Norwich Norfolk NR4 7UH / GB | [2023/44] | Representative(s) | Lau, Sarah Jane, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2023/44] | Application number, filing date | 21844307.5 | 22.12.2021 | [2023/44] | WO2021EP87323 | Priority number, date | GB20200020623 | 24.12.2020 Original published format: GB 202020623 | GB20210016554 | 17.11.2021 Original published format: GB 202116554 | [2023/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2022136563 | Date: | 30.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4267750 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C12P5/00, C12P19/56 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
C12P5/007 (EP);
C12P19/56 (EP,US);
C12N15/8205 (US);
C12N15/8257 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/44] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ENZYME ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON QUILLASÄUREDERIVATEN | [2023/44] | English: | METHODS AND ENZYMES FOR PRODUCING QUILLAIC ACID DERIVATIVES | [2023/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSITIONS | [2023/44] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/44] | 20.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2013142142 (UAB RESEARCH FOUNDATION [US]); | [AD]WO2019122259 (PLANT BIOSCIENCE LTD [GB]); | by applicant | US4436727 | US4866034 | US4877611 | GB2220211 | US4912094 | WO2008153541 | WO2009143457 | WO2013041572 | WO2019122259 | WO2020260475 | WO2020EP67866 |