EP4185598 - TYPE 1 IFN ASSAYS AND METHODS OF DIAGNOSIS FOR SUSCEPTIBILITY TO AND TREATMENT OF VIRAL DISEASE AND VIRAL VACCINES, INCLUDING COVID-19 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.04.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Rockefeller University 1230 York Avenue New York, NY 10065 / US | For all designated states INSERM (Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale) 101 rue de Tolbiac 75013 Paris / FR | For all designated states Assistance Publique-Hôpitaux de Paris (APHP) 3, avenue Victoria 75004 Paris / FR | For all designated states Université Paris Cité 85 boulevard Saint-Germain 75006 Paris / FR | For all designated states Fondation Imagine 24, Boulevard du Montparnasse 75015 Paris / FR | [2023/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CASANOVA, Jean-Laurent New York, NY 10065-6399 / US | [2023/22] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2023/22] | Application number, filing date | 21845697.8 | 22.07.2021 | [2023/22] | WO2021US42741 | Priority number, date | US202063055155P | 22.07.2020 Original published format: US 202063055155 P | US202163141669P | 26.01.2021 Original published format: US 202163141669 P | [2023/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022020569 | Date: | 27.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4185598 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.01.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C07K1/22, A61K35/16, C07K1/16, A61P37/00 | [2023/22] | CPC: |
A61K38/215 (EP);
G01N33/564 (EP,US);
A61K38/21 (EP);
A61K38/212 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
C12Q1/6883 (EP);
C12Q1/70 (EP);
G01N33/5047 (EP);
G01N33/6866 (EP);
C12Q2600/106 (EP);
C12Q2600/156 (EP);
G01N2333/555 (US);
G01N2800/24 (EP,US);
G01N2800/50 (US);
G01N2800/52 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/22] | Title | German: | TYP-1-IFN-ASSAYS UND VERFAHREN ZUR DIAGNOSE DER ANFÄLLIGKEIT FÜR UND BEHANDLUNG VON VIRUSERKRANKUNGEN SOWIE VIRUSIMPFSTOFFE MIT COVID-19 | [2023/22] | English: | TYPE 1 IFN ASSAYS AND METHODS OF DIAGNOSIS FOR SUSCEPTIBILITY TO AND TREATMENT OF VIRAL DISEASE AND VIRAL VACCINES, INCLUDING COVID-19 | [2023/22] | French: | DOSAGES D'IFN DE TYPE 1 ET MÉTHODES DE DIAGNOSTIC DE LA PRÉDISPOSITION À UNE MALADIE VIRALE ET LE TRAITEMENT DE CELLE-CI ET VACCINS VIRAUX, Y COMPRIS CONTRE LA COVID-19 | [2023/22] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 23.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/22] | 29.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2003125657 (KOLL ROBERT [DE], et al) [Y] 5/(1-2)* Abstract *; | [Y] - MEAGER et al., "Anti-Interferon Autoantibodies in Autoimmune Polyendocrinopathy Syndrome Type 1", PLoS Med, (20060613), vol. 3, no. 7, doi:10.1371/journal.pmed.0030289, pages 1152 - 1164, XP002675599 [Y] 1-2, 4/(1-2) * . Abstract; p1153, col 1, para 3; p1153, col 2, para 4; p1154, col 1, last para; p1155, Table 2; p1157, Figure 1 legend; p1158, Figure 2 legend; p1161, col 2, para 3; p1161, col 2, last para * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pmed.0030289 | [Y] - XIA et al., "Inhibition of SARS-CoV-2 (previously 2019-nCoV) infection by a highly potent pan- coronavirus fusion inhibitor targeting its spike protein that harbors a high capacity to mediate membrane fusion", Cell Research, vol. 30, doi:10.1038/s41422-020-0305-x, (20200330), pages 343 - 355, XP037082964 [Y] 1-2, 4/(1-2) * . Abstract; p345, col 1, para 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41422-020-0305-x |