EP4186536 - ANTI-ADHESION POLYMER COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.04.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CG Bio Co., Ltd. (Hannam-dong, Hannam Bldg) 3F, 211, Itaewon-ro Yongsan-gu Seoul 04349 / KR | [2023/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Cho Hee Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13585 / KR | 02 /
YOON, Hong Sun Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 17117 / KR | 03 /
PARK, Hee Jun Seoul 06366 / KR | 04 /
MOON, Bo Mi Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13357 / KR | 05 /
KIM, Gwi Jae Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13242 / KR | 06 /
PARK, Jun Kyu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13643 / KR | [2023/22] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [2023/22] | Application number, filing date | 21845988.1 | 23.07.2021 | [2023/22] | WO2021KR09540 | Priority number, date | KR20200092274 | 24.07.2020 Original published format: KR 20200092274 | [2023/22] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022019701 | Date: | 27.01.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4186536 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.01.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61L24/04, A61L31/04, A61L31/16, A61L31/14, C08L71/02, C08L89/06, C08L5/08, C08K5/053 | [2024/34] | CPC: |
C08L5/08 (EP,KR,US);
A61L31/041 (KR);
C08L53/00 (US);
A61L24/046 (EP);
A61L31/042 (KR);
A61L31/045 (KR);
A61L31/143 (KR);
A61L31/16 (KR);
C08G81/02 (US);
C08K5/053 (KR,US);
C08K5/09 (US);
C08L71/02 (EP,KR);
C08L89/00 (KR);
C08L89/06 (EP);
A61L2300/414 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C08L5/08, C08L89/06 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/22] | A61L31/04, A61L31/16, A61L31/14, C08L71/02, C08L89/00, C08L5/08, C08K5/053 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/22] | Title | German: | ANTIHAFTPOLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2023/22] | English: | ANTI-ADHESION POLYMER COMPOSITION | [2023/22] | French: | COMPOSITION À BASE DE POLYMÈRES ANTI-ADHÉSIVE | [2023/22] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2022 | Translation filed | 24.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 24.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0005974 (NUTRICEUTICALS INC E [US], et al); | [Y]KR20130098768 (CG BIO CO LTD [KR]) | International search | [A]KR20110025530 (AJOU UNIV IND ACAD COOP FOUND [KR]); | [DYDA]KR20130098768 (CG BIO CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20140140212 (KUMOH NAT INST TECH ACAD COOP [KR], et al); | [Y]KR20170047168 (KOO TAE HOON [KR]); | [A]KR20190121630 (ENDO VISION CO LTD [KR], et al); | [PX]KR102189740B (CG BIO CO LTD [KR]) | by applicant | US4188373 | US4474751 | US4478822 | US6280745 | US6294202 | KR101070358B | KR101082935B | KR101330652B |