EP4183914 - LAUNDRY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.04.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qingdao Haier Washing Machine Co., Ltd. No.1 Haier Road Haier Industrial Park Laoshan District Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | For all designated states Haier Smart Home Co., Ltd. Haier Industrial Park No. 1 Haier Road Laoshan District Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | [2023/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Kai Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | 02 /
XU, Sheng Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | 03 /
ZHAO, Zhiqiang Qingdao, Shandong 266101 / CN | [2023/21] | Representative(s) | Bauer, Dirk Bauer Wagner Pellengahr Sroka Patent- & Rechtsanwalts PartG mbB Grüner Weg 1 52070 Aachen / DE | [2023/21] | Application number, filing date | 21846003.8 | 09.07.2021 | [2023/21] | WO2021CN105393 | Priority number, date | CN202010717067 | 23.07.2020 Original published format: CN202010717067 | [2023/21] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022017194 | Date: | 27.01.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4183914 | Date: | 24.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 27.01.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | D06F39/08, D06F58/20, D06F35/00, // D06F25/00, D06F58/02, D06F39/02 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
D06F39/088 (EP,CN);
D06F35/008 (EP);
D06F39/00 (CN);
D06F39/10 (CN);
D06F25/00 (EP);
D06F39/02 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/21] | D06F39/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/21] | Title | German: | WÄSCHEPFLEGEGERÄT | [2023/21] | English: | LAUNDRY DEVICE | [2023/21] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE BLANCHISSERIE | [2023/21] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2023 | Translation filed | 15.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 15.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/21] | 13.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2013030266 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE], et al) [A] 1-10* figure 1 *; | [A]US2018087210 (BEHR MARKUS [DE]) [A] 1-10 * figure 1 * * claim 1 *; | [XI]DE102017216516 (BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,6,7,10 * figures 1, 3a-3b * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0031] * [I] 4,5 |