EP4186597 - THIRD-STAGE SYSTEM WITH AUTOMATIC BLEEDING, AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.04.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Petróleo Brasileiro S.A. - Petrobras Avenida República do Chile No. 65 Centro 20031-912 Rio de Janeiro - RJ / BR | [2023/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KENZO HUZIWARA, Wilson 20261-005 Rio de Janeiro / BR | 02 /
DIEGO GRACZYK, Rafael 83900-000 São Mateus do Sul / BR | 03 /
FREIRE SANDES, Emanuel 12243-231 São José dos Campos / BR | [2023/22] | Representative(s) | Clarke, Modet y Cía., S.L. C/ Suero de Quiñones 34-36 28002 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2023/22] | Clarke Modet & Co. C/ Suero de Quiñones 34-36 28002 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 21846134.1 | 19.07.2021 | [2023/22] | WO2021BR50305 | Priority number, date | BR20201014856 | 21.07.2020 Original published format: BR102020014856 | [2023/22] | Filing language | PT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022016248 | Date: | 27.01.2022 | Language: | PT | [2022/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4186597 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | BR | 27.01.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B04C5/28, B04C5/30, B04C3/04, B04C3/06, B01J8/00, C10G11/18, B01D45/12 | [2023/22] | CPC: |
C10G11/18 (EP);
B04C3/04 (BR);
B04C5/103 (US);
B01D45/12 (EP);
B04C11/00 (US);
B04C3/06 (BR);
B04C5/18 (EP);
B04C5/28 (EP);
B04C5/30 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/22] | Title | German: | SYSTEM DER DRITTEN STUFE MIT AUTOMATISCHER BLUTUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2023/22] | English: | THIRD-STAGE SYSTEM WITH AUTOMATIC BLEEDING, AND USE THEREOF | [2023/22] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TROISIÈME ÉTAGE AVEC AUTO-PURGE ET SON UTILISATION | [2023/22] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2023 | Translation filed | 06.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 06.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US5681450 (CHITNIS GIRISH K [US], et al); | [YA]WO0141934 (RIBERA SALCEDO ROMUALDO LUIS [PT]); | [A]US2009269260 (LIU GUOHAI [US]); | [YA]US2018043292 (CARROLL CIAN SEAMUS [US]) | International search | [A]GB2077631 (TONGEREN U K LTD VAN); | [A]US5464528 (OWEN HARTLEY [US], et al); | [A]US5643537 (RATERMAN MICHAEL F [US], et al); | [A]US2002144931 (SECHRIST PAUL A [US], et al); | [A]US2004166033 (MILLER RICHARD B [US], et al); | [A]US2004208801 (HUZIWARA WILSON KENZO [BR], et al); | [A]US8470081 (KULPRATHIPANJA SATHIT [US], et al) | by applicant | US2047373 | GB2077631 | CA1161374 | US5643537 | US5681450 | US5779746 | WO0141934 | US6673133 | US6797026 | US6902593 | US7081229 | US7648544 | US8287613 |