EP4167827 - REFLECTION BASED CORNEAL TOPOGRAPHY SYSTEM USING PRISMS FOR IMPROVED ACCURACY AND METHOD OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Van Saarloos, Paul Phillip B-22-2, Mira Residence, Lintang Lembah Permai 17 Tanjung Tokong, Tanjung Bungah Pulau Pinang, 11200 / MY | [2023/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2023/17] | Representative(s) | Sahuquillo Huerta, Jesús Jesana Patentes, SL Jesana iP C/ Huesca 5 ,Oficina 2 46001 Valencia / ES | [2023/17] | Application number, filing date | 21846251.3 | 05.07.2021 | [2023/17] | WO2021MY50055 | Priority number, date | MY2020PI03761 | 21.07.2020 Original published format: MYPI2020003761 | [2023/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022019751 | Date: | 27.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4167827 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 27.01.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61B3/107, // G01B11/25 | [2023/49] | CPC: |
A61B3/107 (EP,AU,US);
A61B3/152 (US);
G01B11/25 (AU);
G01B11/2513 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/17] | A61B3/107 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/17] | Title | German: | REFLEXIONSBASIERTES HORNHAUTTOPOGRAPHIESYSTEM MIT PRISMEN FÜR VERBESSERTE GENAUIGKEIT UND VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN | [2023/17] | English: | REFLECTION BASED CORNEAL TOPOGRAPHY SYSTEM USING PRISMS FOR IMPROVED ACCURACY AND METHOD OF USE | [2023/17] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TOPOGRAPHIE CORNÉENNE FONDÉE SUR LA RÉFLEXION FAISANT INTERVENIR DES PRISMES POUR LA PRÉCISION AMÉLIORÉE ET PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION | [2023/17] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 23.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/17] | 06.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]DE1572779 (RODENSTOCK OPTIK G) [I] 1-7 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 5, paragraph 3 * * figure 1 *; | [XAI]US6190012 (ISHIKURA YASUHISA [JP]) [X] 1-6,8-10,14,15 * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 32 * * column 4, lines 4-32 * * column 5, lines 15-39 * * column 5, line 62 - column 6, line 21 * * column 7, lines 17-29 * * column 8, lines 13-28 * * column 8, line 66 - column 9, line 6 * * figures 1-8 * [A] 11-13 [I] 7; | [XI]US2005018132 (FUKUMA YASUFUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0069] - [0103] * * paragraphs [0523] - [0553] * * figures 1-9, 31-33 * [I] 7; | [E]WO2021236976 (TRACEY TECH CORP [US]) [E] 1-15 * page 9, lines 16-23 * * page 10, lines 24-33 * * page 12, lines 1-22 * * figure 1B ** claims 13, 17-20, 23 * | International search | [A]US4540254 (HUMPHREY WILLIAM E [US]) [A] 1-15* Whole document *; | [A]US5684562 (FUJIEDA MASANAO [JP]) [A] 1-15 * Whole document *; | [A]US6152565 (LIU DAVID D [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * Whole document *; | [A]US2003071968 (LAI MING [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * Whole document *; | [A]US2004066489 (BENEDIKT JEAN [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * Whole document *; | [A]US2013201451 (SIMONOV ALEKSEY NIKOLAEVICH [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * Whole document * |