Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
11.06.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] |
07.06.2024 | Change - classification | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] |
07.06.2024 | Change - classification | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] |
22.09.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 25.10.2023 [2023/43] |
22.09.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 25.10.2023 [2023/43] |
21.07.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
21.04.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 24.05.2023 [2023/21] |
21.04.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 24.05.2023 [2023/21] |
03.04.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
20.02.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
13.02.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
13.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
10.02.2023 | Change - representative | |
10.02.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
28.01.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
28.01.2022 | New entry: applicant or inventor |