Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3190113 | Global Dossier | 27.01.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202117379069 | 19.07.2021 | WO2021US42301 | 20.07.2021 | US202063056003 | 24.07.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4185852 | Global Dossier | 03.01.2024 | A4 | EP4185852 | 31.05.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202117379069 | 19.07.2021 | WO2021US42301 | 20.07.2021 | US202063056003 | 24.07.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022020306 | Global Dossier | 27.01.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202117379069 | 19.07.2021 | US202063056003 | 24.07.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022026305 | Global Dossier | 27.01.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202117379069 | 19.07.2021 | US202063056003 | 24.07.2020 |