EP4186999 - TERMINAL MATERIAL FOR CONNECTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.04.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Materials Corporation 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8117 / JP | [2023/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TARUTANI, Yoshie Naka-shi, Ibaraki 311-0102 / JP | 02 /
KATOU, Naoki Tokyo 100-8117 / JP | 03 /
KUBOTA, Kenji Naka-shi, Ibaraki 311-0102 / JP | [2023/22] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [2023/22] | Application number, filing date | 21847175.3 | 24.02.2021 | [2023/22] | WO2021JP06759 | Priority number, date | JP20200125673 | 22.07.2020 Original published format: JP 2020125673 | JP20210015188 | 02.02.2021 Original published format: JP 2021015188 | [2023/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022018896 | Date: | 27.01.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4186999 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.01.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C25D3/64, C25D5/12, C25D7/00, B32B15/01, H01R13/03, C25D5/00, C25D3/46, C25D5/02, // C25D3/12 | [2024/31] | CPC: |
C25D5/12 (EP);
H01R43/16 (US);
B32B15/01 (EP);
C25D3/46 (EP);
C25D3/64 (EP,US);
C25D5/02 (EP);
C25D5/611 (EP);
C25D5/617 (EP);
C25D7/00 (EP);
C25D7/0607 (US);
H01R13/03 (EP);
C25D3/12 (EP);
H01R2201/26 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/22] | C25D3/64, C25D5/12, C25D7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/22] | Title | German: | ANSCHLUSSMATERIAL FÜR VERBINDER | [2023/22] | English: | TERMINAL MATERIAL FOR CONNECTORS | [2023/22] | French: | MATÉRIAU DE BORNE POUR CONNECTEURS | [2023/22] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2023 | Translation filed | 08.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 08.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/22] | 23.07.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN111188070 (HUIZHOU CHINA EAGLE ELECT TECH CO LTD); | [A]EP3666930 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP [JP]) | International search | [A]JPH07252684 (HERAEUS GMBH W C); | [A]WO2016157713 (ORIENTAL ELECTRO PLATING CORP [JP]) | by applicant | JP2008169408 | JP2009079250 | JP2020125673 | JP2021015188 |