EP4268468 - MULTI-PASS DECODER-SIDE MOTION VECTOR REFINEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED ATTN: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2023/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Zhi San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
HUANG, Han San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
CHEN, Chun-Chi San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
ZHANG, Yan San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
SEREGIN, Vadim San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 06 /
KARCZEWICZ, Marta San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2023/44] | Representative(s) | Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/44] | Loveless, Ian Mark Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 21847599.4 | 21.12.2021 | [2023/44] | WO2021US64537 | Priority number, date | US202063129221P | 22.12.2020 Original published format: US 202063129221 P | US202117556142 | 20.12.2021 Original published format: US202117556142 | [2023/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022140338 | Date: | 30.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4268468 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/533, H04N19/577, H04N19/44, H04N19/56, H04N19/57 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
H04N19/533 (EP,IL,KR);
H04N19/139 (KR);
H04N19/176 (KR);
H04N19/44 (EP,IL);
H04N19/56 (EP,IL,KR);
H04N19/57 (EP,IL,KR);
H04N19/577 (EP,IL,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/44] | Title | German: | DECODERSEITIGE BEWEGUNGSVEKTORVERFEINERUNG MIT MEHREREN DURCHGÄNGEN | [2023/44] | English: | MULTI-PASS DECODER-SIDE MOTION VECTOR REFINEMENT | [2023/44] | French: | AFFINEMENT DE VECTEURS DE MOUVEMENT CÔTÉ DÉCODEUR À PASSAGES MULTIPLES | [2023/44] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/44] | 04.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2018121506 (MEDIATEK INC [CN]) [X] 1-5,16-20,31,32 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0073]; figure 8 * * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0091]; figure 10 * * paragraph [0130]; figure 18 *; | [I]US2019238883 (CHEN CHUN-CHIA [TW], et al) [I] 1,3,6,7,9,11-16,18,21,22,24,26-32 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0093] *; | [X]WO2020182216 (MEDIATEK INC [CN]) [X] 1-7,16-22,31,32 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0027]; figures 8,9,10 * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0093] *; | [XI] - GAO HAN ET AL, "Decoder-Side Motion Vector Refinement in VVC: Algorithm and Hardware Implementation Considerations", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, IEEE, USA, vol. 31, no. 8, doi:10.1109/TCSVT.2020.3037024, ISSN 1051-8215, (20201109), pages 3197 - 3211, (20210802), XP011870333 [X] 1-8,16-23,31,32 * the whole document * [I] 10,25 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCSVT.2020.3037024 | [XP] - Y-J CHANG (QUALCOMM) ET AL, "EE2: Tests of compression efficiency methods beyond VVC", no. JVET-V0120 ; m56535, (20210422), 22. JVET MEETING; 20210420 - 20210428; TELECONFERENCE; (THE JOINT VIDEO EXPLORATION TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, URL: https://jvet-experts.org/doc_end_user/documents/22_Teleconference/wg11/JVET-V0120-v3.zip JVET-V0120-v2.docx, (20210422), XP030294307 [XP] 1-10,16-25,31,32 * section [4.4 Multi-pass decoder side motion vectr refinement (test 3.4) * |