Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024050466 | Global Dossier | 15.02.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021US64340 | 20.12.2021 | US202063128904 | 22.12.2020 | US202118258101 | 20.12.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN116761594 | Global Dossier | 15.09.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2021US64340 | 20.12.2021 | US202063128904 | 22.12.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4267116 | Global Dossier | 01.11.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021US64340 | 20.12.2021 | US202063128904 | 22.12.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022140253 | Global Dossier | 30.06.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202063128904 | 22.12.2020 |