EP4188397 - UNIVERSAL ANTIGEN-SPECIFIC T CELL BANKS AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING THE SAME THERAPEUTICALLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baylor College of Medicine One Baylor Plaza Houston, TX 77030 / US | [2023/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEEN, Ann Marie Houston, Texas 77030 / US | 02 /
VERA VALDES, Juan Fernando Houston, Texas 77030 / US | [2023/23] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2023/23] | Application number, filing date | 21848816.1 | 02.02.2021 | [2023/23] | WO2021US16266 | Priority number, date | WO2020US44080 | 29.07.2020 Original published format: PCT/US2020/044080 | [2023/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022025984 | Date: | 03.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4188397 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/17, A61K39/00, C12N5/0783 | [2023/23] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6881 (EP,IL,KR);
C12N5/0636 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K2239/38 (EP,IL,US);
A61K35/17 (KR);
A61K39/215 (KR);
A61K39/4611 (EP,IL,US);
A61K39/464838 (EP,IL,US);
A61P31/12 (US);
A61P35/00 (KR);
A61P37/02 (KR);
G01N33/56966 (KR);
C12N2501/2304 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/23] | Title | German: | UNIVERSELLE ANTIGENSPEZIFISCHE T-ZELLBANKEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAVON THERAPEUTISCH | [2023/23] | English: | UNIVERSAL ANTIGEN-SPECIFIC T CELL BANKS AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING THE SAME THERAPEUTICALLY | [2023/23] | French: | BANQUES DE LYMPHOCYTES T SPÉCIFIQUES CONTRE L'ANTIGÈNE UNIVERSEL ET LEURS MÉTHODES DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION THÉRAPEUTIQUE | [2023/23] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 02.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/23] | 06.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2024 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   12.04.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2015075175 (CELLECTIS [FR]); | International search | [Y]WO02077030 (AVIDEX LTD [GB], et al); | [XY]US2016296563 (SOURDIVE DAVID [FR], et al) |