EP4191910 - DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 09.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tendyron Corporation Yu Haitao, Room 1810, Block B No. 38 XueQing Road Haidian District Beijing 100083 / CN | [2023/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Dongsheng Beijing 100083 / CN | [2023/23] | Representative(s) | Yang, Shu Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2023/23] | Application number, filing date | 21849106.6 | 25.06.2021 | [2023/23] | WO2021CN102270 | Priority number, date | CN202010744998 | 29.07.2020 Original published format: CN202010744998 | [2023/23] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022022183 | Date: | 03.02.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4191910 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/1607, H04B3/54, // H04L27/20, H04L1/12 | [2024/03] | CPC: |
H04B3/542 (EP,CN,US);
H04L1/0006 (CN);
H04L1/1607 (EP,CN,US);
H04L27/2067 (EP,US);
H04L2001/125 (EP);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/23] | H04L1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/23] | Title | German: | DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2023/23] | English: | DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2023/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES | [2023/23] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2023 | Translation filed | 01.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 01.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/23] | 09.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6954800 (MALLORY TRACY D [US]) [A] 1,2 * column 10, line 22 - line 45 * * column 12, line 6 - line 23 * * column 18, line 10 - column 19, line 15 *; | [I]US2008240031 (NASSIRI-TOUSSI KARIM [US], et al) [I] 1,2 * paragraph [0154] - paragraph [0160] * * paragraph [0165] - paragraph [0170] * * paragraph [0229] * * figures 16-24 *; | [A] - XUDONG WANG ET AL, "Analog network coding without restrictions on superimposed frames", IEEE /ACM TRANSACTIONS ON NETWORKING, IEEE / ACM, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20160401), vol. 24, no. 2, ISSN 1063-6692, pages 788 - 805, XP058282410 [A] 1,2 * page 791, column l, paragraph III.A * * page 796, column r, paragraph IV.B * |