EP4174163 - FROZEN EGG CULTIVATION APPARATUS, AND METHOD FOR CULTIVATING FROZEN EGGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Yamanashi 4-37 Takeda 4-chome Kofu-shi, Yamanashi 400-8510 / JP | [2023/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAKAYAMA, Teruhiko Kofu-shi, Yamanashi 400-8510 / JP | 02 /
WAKAYAMA, Sayaka Kofu-shi, Yamanashi 400-8510 / JP | 03 /
SUZUKI, Tomomi Chofu-shi, Tokyo 182-8522 / JP | 04 /
YAMAZAKI, Chiaki Chofu-shi, Tokyo 182-8522 / JP | [2023/18] | Representative(s) | Richardt Patentanwälte PartG mbB Wilhelmstraße 7 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | [2023/18] | Application number, filing date | 21849563.8 | 28.07.2021 | [2023/18] | WO2021JP27820 | Priority number, date | JP20200127635 | 28.07.2020 Original published format: JP 2020127635 | JP20210122191 | 27.07.2021 Original published format: JP 2021122191 | [2023/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022025092 | Date: | 03.02.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4174163 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/00, C12M3/00, C12N5/071, C12N5/073 | [2023/18] | CPC: |
C12N5/0608 (EP);
C12N5/0609 (US);
C12M21/06 (US);
C12M29/00 (US);
C12M45/00 (EP);
C12M45/22 (EP);
C12M99/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/18] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR KULTIVIERUNG GEFRORENER EIER UND VERFAHREN ZUR KULTIVIERUNG GEFRORENER EIER | [2023/18] | English: | FROZEN EGG CULTIVATION APPARATUS, AND METHOD FOR CULTIVATING FROZEN EGGS | [2023/18] | French: | APPAREIL DE CULTURE D'OEUFS CONGELÉS ET PROCÉDÉ DE CULTURE D'OEUFS CONGELÉS | [2023/18] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2023 | Translation filed | 25.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 25.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/18] | 14.08.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2024 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]WO2007052653 (STREX INC [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6 * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0088] - paragraph [0041] * * figures * [A] 3,8,9 [I] 7; | [XAI]KR100936276B (KOREA ADVANCED INST SCI & TECH [KR]) [X] 1,2,4,6 * the whole document * [A] 3,8,9 [I] 7; | [A]JP3226911U (REPRO SUPPORT MEDICAL RESEARCH CENTER CO., LTD.) [A] 1,7,8 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0046] * * figures ** paragraph [0049] * | International search | [A]JP2009148218 (UNIV MEIJI, et al) [A] 1-9 * claims, paragraph [0010], fig. 1 *; | [A]JP2010130999 (CELL TECHNOLOGIES INC T, et al) [A] 1-9* claims, fig. 1-17 *; | [A]JP2017118884 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * claims, fig. 1 *; | [A]JP2020517269 (FUJIFILM IRVINE SCIENTIFIC INC.) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0098]-[0101], fig. 11 *; | [A]JP3226911U (REPRO SUPPORT MEDICAL RESEARCH CENTER CO., LTD.) [A] 1-9 * first embodiment, second embodiment, fig. 1-13 * | by applicant | JP2001070402 | JP2009148218 | JP2010130999 |