EP4156105 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SPATIAL POSITIONING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Matrixed Reality Technology Co., Ltd. No. 2-3, Xinji Road Singapore Industrial Park Xinwu District Wuxi, Jiangsu 214028 / CN | [2024/04] |
Former [2023/13] | For all designated states Matrixed Reality Technology Co., Ltd. No.6, Xingchuang Second Road Wuxi Singapore Industrial Park, Xinwu District Wuxi, Jiangsu 214028 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LV, Xianwei Beijing 100098 / CN | 02 /
YOU, Zhenxing Beijing 100098 / CN | 03 /
HAN, Rui Beijing 100098 / CN | [2023/13] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2023/13] | Application number, filing date | 21850314.2 | 26.07.2021 | [2023/13] | WO2021CN108394 | Priority number, date | CN202010729794 | 27.07.2020 Original published format: CN202010729794 | [2023/13] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022022449 | Date: | 03.02.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4156105 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/73, G06T19/00, G06F3/03, G06F3/0346, G06F3/038 | [2023/49] | CPC: |
G06F3/0304 (EP);
G06T7/74 (EP,CN);
G06T11/60 (US);
G06F3/0346 (EP);
G06F3/038 (EP);
G06T11/001 (US);
G06T19/006 (CN);
G06T7/73 (US);
G06T7/90 (US);
|
Former IPC [2023/13] | G06T7/73, G06T19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/13] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR RÄUMLICHEN POSITIONIERUNG | [2023/13] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SPATIAL POSITIONING | [2023/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE POSITIONNEMENT SPATIAL | [2023/13] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2022 | Translation filed | 21.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2022 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/13] | 10.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2010141378 (SONY COMPUTER ENTERTAINMENT INC [JP], et al); | [Y]US2016232715 (LEE FANGWEI [US]); | [A]US2017185081 (STEELE EDWIN [CA], et al); | [A]US2018150686 (VANDONKELAAR SCOTT [AU]); | [A]CN109658445 (MEGVII TECH LTD); | [XAYI]US10719953 (YE YUTING [US], et al); |