EP4189651 - ELECTROMECHANICAL LOCKS AND RELATED METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lock II, LLC 1014 South Main Street Nichilasville, KY 40356 / US | [2023/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILLER, J., Clayton Nicholasville, KY 40356 / US | 02 /
HARVEY, Michael, P. Laguna Niguel, CA 92677 / US | [2023/23] | Representative(s) | Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/23] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 21850794.5 | 28.07.2021 | [2023/23] | WO2021US43470 | Priority number, date | US202063057362P | 28.07.2020 Original published format: US 202063057362 P | [2023/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022026556 | Date: | 03.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4189651 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G07C9/00, E05B15/00, E05B47/00, E05B49/00 | [2023/23] | CPC: |
G07C9/00912 (EP);
E05B65/0075 (EP,US);
E05B17/226 (EP,US);
E05B37/00 (US);
E05B49/00 (EP);
E05B63/00 (US);
E05G1/04 (EP,US);
E05G1/10 (US);
H02K7/116 (US);
H02K7/1853 (US);
H02S10/10 (US);
E05B2047/0062 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/23] | Title | German: | ELEKTROMECHANISCHE SCHLÖSSER UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VERFAHREN | [2023/23] | English: | ELECTROMECHANICAL LOCKS AND RELATED METHODS | [2023/23] | French: | CADENAS ÉLECTROMÉCANIQUES ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2023/23] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 22.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/23] | 07.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3208818 (WINKHAUS FA AUGUST [DE]); | [A]US5265452 (DAWSON GERALD L [US], et al); | [XAI]US5493882 (JASPER THOMAS E [US]); | [A]US2010180649 (HARVEY MICHAEL P [US]); | [A]WO2018222817 (LOCK II L L C [US]) | International search | [A]US2014225375 (CHANG YU HSIANG [TW]); | [A]US2017051531 (MIN HAO [CN], et al); | [A]US2019119949 (ROATIS CALIN [US], et al); | [A]US2020095803 (MILLER J CLAYTON [US], et al); | [A]US2020141157 (MILLER J CLAYTON [US], et al) |