EP4189045 - FLUID CATALYTIC CRACKING CATALYST COMPOSITION FOR ENHANCED BUTYLENE TO PROPYLENE SELECTIVITY RATIO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF CORPORATION 100 Park Avenue Florham Park, NJ 07932 / US | [2023/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE SILVA, Wathudura Indika, Namal Iselin, 08830 / US | 02 /
STOCKWELL, David, M. Iselin, NJ 08830 / US | 03 /
YILMAZ, Bilge Iselin, NJ 08830 / US | 04 /
WEI, Junmei Iselin, NJ 08830 / US | [2023/23] | Representative(s) | Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/23] | BASF IP Association BASF SE GBI-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 21850805.9 | 30.07.2021 | [2023/23] | WO2021US43979 | Priority number, date | US202063059227P | 31.07.2020 Original published format: US 202063059227 P | [2023/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022026878 | Date: | 03.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4189045 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C10G47/00, B01J21/04, B01J29/08, B01J29/70, B01J29/80 | [2024/32] | CPC: |
C10G11/05 (EP);
C07C4/06 (US);
B01J21/04 (EP,US);
B01J23/10 (EP,US);
B01J29/084 (EP,US);
B01J29/7007 (EP,US);
B01J29/80 (EP);
B01J29/83 (EP);
B01J35/51 (US);
B01J35/613 (US);
B01J35/615 (US);
B01J37/28 (EP);
C10G11/18 (EP);
B01J2029/062 (US);
C07C2521/04 (US);
C07C2523/10 (US);
C07C2529/08 (US);
C07C2529/70 (US);
C07C2529/80 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/23] | C10G47/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/23] | Title | German: | KATALYTISCHE CRACKING-KATALYSATORZUSAMMENSETZUNG IN DER WIRBELSCHICHT FÜR VERBESSERTES BUTYLEN-PROPYLEN-SELEKTIVITÄTSVERHÄLTNIS | [2023/23] | English: | FLUID CATALYTIC CRACKING CATALYST COMPOSITION FOR ENHANCED BUTYLENE TO PROPYLENE SELECTIVITY RATIO | [2023/23] | French: | COMPOSITION DE CATALYSEUR DE CRAQUAGE CATALYTIQUE FLUIDE À RAPPORT DE SÉLECTIVITÉ DE BUTYLÈNE/PROPYLÈNE AMÉLIORÉ | [2023/23] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 28.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/23] | 20.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2013066131 (HARRIS DAVID H [US]); | [A]WO2018213406 (BASF CORP [US]) | International search | [A]US4740292 (CHEN NAI Y [US], et al); | [XY]US5314612 (EBERLY PAUL E [US], et al); | [Y]US2008293561 (LONG JUN [CN], et al); | [A]WO2010077537 (UOP LLC [US], et al); | [A]WO2014042641 (BASF CORP [US], et al); | [YA]US2020078774 (WEI JUNMEI [US], et al) |