EP4105766 - IMAGE DISPLAY METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND COMPUTER DEVICE AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2022 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tencent Technology (Shenzhen) Company Limited 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong, 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2022/51] | For all designated states Tencent Technology (Shenzhen) Company Limited 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHENG, Yuanli Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
XIE, Jianping Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
LIU, Jie Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2022/51] | Representative(s) | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/51] | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21850955.2 | 17.06.2021 | [2022/51] | WO2021CN100490 | Priority number, date | CN202010753135 | 30.07.2020 Original published format: CN202010753135 | [2022/51] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022022141 | Date: | 03.02.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4105766 | Date: | 21.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/01, G06T7/73 | [2023/40] | CPC: |
G06F3/012 (EP,CN);
G06T7/74 (US);
G06F3/011 (EP,US);
G06F3/013 (EP);
G06F3/014 (EP);
G06F3/017 (EP);
G06F3/0346 (US);
G06T19/006 (US);
G06T7/73 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/51] | G06F3/01, G06K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/51] | Title | German: | BILDANZEIGEVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG SOWIE COMPUTERVORRICHTUNG UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2022/51] | English: | IMAGE DISPLAY METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND COMPUTER DEVICE AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2022/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE D'IMAGE, ET DISPOSITIF INFORMATIQUE ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE | [2022/51] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2022 | Translation filed | 15.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 15.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/51] | 09.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]KR101340555B (KWANGJU INST SCI & TECH [KR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0040] *; | [XAY] - SICONG DU ET AL, "GPO: Global Plane Optimization for Fast and Accurate Monocular SLAM Initialization", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20200425), XP081652805 [X] 1,7-9,12-15 * chapter III, paragraphs 1-2;; figure 1 * * chapter III.A, paragraphs 1-2 * * chapter III.B;; figure 2 * * chapter IV.C * * chapter IV.G;; figure 8 * [A] 2-4 [Y] 5,6,10,11 | [Y] - LI LING ET AL, "A flexible markerless registration method for video augmented reality", MULTIMEDIA SIGNAL PROCESSING (MMSP), 2011 IEEE 13TH INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON, IEEE, (20111017), doi:10.1109/MMSP.2011.6093790, ISBN 978-1-4577-1432-0, pages 1 - 6, XP032027530 [Y] 5,6,10,11 * chapter III, paragraph 1 * * chapter III.B;; figures 3, 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MMSP.2011.6093790 |