EP4189729 - METHOD FOR REMOVING HARD MASKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Entegris, Inc. 129 Concord Road Billerica, MA 01821 / US | [2023/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Hsing-Chen Hsinchu, 300 / TW | 02 /
COOPER, Emanuel I. Scarsdale, New York 10583 / US | 03 /
YANG, Min-Chieh Hsinchu, 31061 / TW | [2023/23] | Representative(s) | Greaves Brewster LLP Copa House Station Road Cheddar, Somerset BS27 3AH / GB | [2023/23] | Application number, filing date | 21850969.3 | 30.07.2021 | [2023/23] | WO2021US43894 | Priority number, date | US202063058997P | 30.07.2020 Original published format: US 202063058997 P | [2023/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022026822 | Date: | 03.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4189729 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/311 | [2024/34] | CPC: |
H01L21/31111 (EP,US);
C09K13/04 (EP,US);
C09K13/06 (EP,US);
C09K13/10 (EP,US);
H01L21/311 (US);
H01L21/31133 (US);
H10B69/00 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/23] | H01L21/311, H01L21/02, H01L21/033, H01L21/3213 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/23] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ENTFERNEN VON HARTEN MASKEN | [2023/23] | English: | METHOD FOR REMOVING HARD MASKS | [2023/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ÉLIMINATION DE MASQUES DURS | [2023/23] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 23.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/23] | 06.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US2009281016 (COOPER EMANUEL [US], et al); | [XYI]US2014206195 (LAUERHAAS JEFFREY M [US]) | International search | [A]JP2009147055 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [XY]US2009281016 (COOPER EMANUEL [US], et al); | [Y]US2010136794 (FERSTL BERTHOLD [DE], et al); | [A]US2011275221 (SCHIER HERBERT [AT]); | [A]KR20200032782 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al) |