EP4277832 - VEHICLE WITH A STRUCTURE HAVING A VARIABLE-STIFFNESS ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | 15.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stellantis Auto SAS 2-10 Boulevard de l'Europe 78300 Poissy / FR | [2023/50] |
Former [2023/47] | For all designated states PSA Automobiles SA 2-10 Boulevard de l'Europe 78300 Poissy / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THOR, Tou 25150 Pont de Roide Vermondans / FR | 02 /
BORNIER, Paul 70400 Luze / FR | 03 /
FONFREDE, Stéphane 90000 Belfort / FR | [2023/47] | Application number, filing date | 21851673.0 | 14.12.2021 | [2023/47] | WO2021FR52321 | Priority number, date | FR20210000283 | 13.01.2021 Original published format: FR 2100283 | [2023/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022152988 | Date: | 21.07.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4277832 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B62D25/04 | [2023/47] | CPC: |
B62D25/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/47] | Title | German: | FAHRZEUG MIT EINER STRUKTUR MIT EINEM ELEMENT MIT VARIABLER STEIFIGKEIT | [2023/47] | English: | VEHICLE WITH A STRUCTURE HAVING A VARIABLE-STIFFNESS ELEMENT | [2023/47] | French: | VÉHICULE À STRUCTURE À ÉLÉMENT À RAIDEUR VARIABLE | [2023/47] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/47] | 13.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5671968 (MASUDA TOSHIO [JP], et al); | [XAY]FR2890361 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]); | [XA]FR2933059 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]); | [A]US7815247 (OBAYASHI AKIRA [JP]); | [YA]FR2979608 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]); | [A]US8651562 (ZOERNACK MARKUS [DE], et al); | [AD]EP2310246 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [A]WO2015077185 (MAGNA INT INC [CA], et al) | by applicant | FR2100283 | EP2310246 |