EP4272060 - REAL-TIME VIDEO COMMUNICATION INTERFACE WITH HAPTIC FEEDBACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.07.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Snap Inc. 3000 31st Street Santa Monica, CA 90405 / US | [2023/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THOMAS, Mark Santa Monica, California 90405 / US | 02 /
POWELL, Alexander P. Santa Monica, California 90405 / US | [2023/45] | Representative(s) | Kramer, Dani, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2023/45] | Application number, filing date | 21851758.9 | 29.12.2021 | [2023/45] | WO2021US65547 | Priority number, date | US202063133048P | 31.12.2020 Original published format: US 202063133048 P | [2023/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022147151 | Date: | 07.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4272060 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/01, G06F3/04883, H04M1/724, H04N7/14, H04L65/403, H04N21/4788 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
G06F3/016 (EP,KR,US);
H04N7/147 (KR,US);
G06F3/0488 (EP);
G06F3/04883 (KR,US);
G06Q10/10 (EP,KR);
G06Q30/02 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/45] | Title | German: | ECHTZEIT-VIDEOKOMMUNIKATIONSSCHNITTSTELLE MIT HAPTISCHER RÜCKMELDUNG | [2023/45] | English: | REAL-TIME VIDEO COMMUNICATION INTERFACE WITH HAPTIC FEEDBACK | [2023/45] | French: | INTERFACE DE COMMUNICATION VIDÉO EN TEMPS RÉEL À RÉTROACTION HAPTIQUE | [2023/45] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/45] | 28.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP2457141 (IMMERSION CORP [US]); | [I]EP2561424 (IMMERSION CORP [US], et al); | [I]EP2629176 (IMMERSION CORP [US]); | [A]US2014313142 (YAIRI MICAH [US]); | [A]WO2016036427 (APPLE INC [US]); | [A]EP3506626 (HYPERCONNECT INC [KR]) |