EP4195462 - INSULATING MATERIAL FOR STATOR, STATOR, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING STATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.02.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Resonac Corporation 9-1, Higashi-Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-7325 / JP | [2024/13] |
Former [2023/30] | For all designated states Resonac Corporation 13-9, Shiba Daimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8518 / JP | ||
Former [2023/24] | For all designated states Showa Denko Materials Co., Ltd. 9-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6606 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIYAMA, Tomoo Tokyo 100-6606 / JP | 02 /
MURASUGI, Narutoshi Tokyo 100-6606 / JP | [2023/24] | Representative(s) | Becker, Eberhard Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [2023/24] | Application number, filing date | 21852768.7 | 20.07.2021 | [2023/24] | WO2021JP27201 | Priority number, date | JP20200134787 | 07.08.2020 Original published format: JP 2020134787 | [2023/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022030252 | Date: | 10.02.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4195462 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01B3/00, H01B3/40, H02K3/30, H02K3/34, H02K15/12, H02K1/04 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
H02K1/04 (EP);
H01B3/002 (EP);
H01B3/40 (EP);
H02K3/30 (EP);
Y02T10/64 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/24] | H02K3/30, H02K3/34, H02K15/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/24] | Title | German: | ISOLIERMATERIAL FÜR STATOR, STATOR UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES STATORS | [2023/24] | English: | INSULATING MATERIAL FOR STATOR, STATOR, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING STATOR | [2023/24] | French: | MATÉRIAU ISOLANT POUR STATOR, STATOR ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE STATOR | [2023/24] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2022 | Translation filed | 21.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2022 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/24] | 26.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2015075906 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-12 * Sample # 4;; figure 2A *; | [X]US2017301429 (GROEPPEL PETER [DE], et al) [X] 1-12 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0042]; examples 1-3; claims 1-9 * * paragraph [0018] *; | [X]JP2018016669 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO) [X] 1-12 * claims 1-8 ** paragraph [0064] *; | [X]EP3310838 (HUNTSMAN ADV MAT LICENSING SWITZERLAND GMBH [CH]) [X] 1-12 * paragraph [0051]; claims 1-12 * * paragraph [0038] * | International search | [Y]JPS5473205 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 11* page 1, lower right column, lines 1-20 *; | [YX]JP2018016669 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO) [Y] 11 [X] 1-10, 12 | by applicant | JP2009261086 | WO2013121590 | JP2017005870 | JP2019170105 | JP2020134787 |