EP4192410 - BED PAN ASSEMBLY WITH EXCRETION ANALYZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neowe Inc. 1200 NW 78th Ave. Suite 112 Doral, FL 33126 / US | [2023/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARSHALL, Michelle Hollywood, Florida 33019 / US | [2023/24] | Representative(s) | Hutchinson, Thomas Owen Hutchinson IP Ltd 57 Hoghton Street Southport, Merseyside PR9 0PG / GB | [2023/24] | Application number, filing date | 21853037.6 | 04.08.2021 | [2023/24] | WO2021US44579 | Priority number, date | US202063060915P | 04.08.2020 Original published format: US 202063060915 P | [2023/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022031873 | Date: | 10.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4192410 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61G9/00, A61B10/00, G01N33/483, G01N21/25, G01N21/27 | [2023/24] | CPC: |
A61B10/007 (EP);
A61G9/003 (EP,US);
A61B10/0038 (EP,US);
A61B5/0002 (US);
A61B5/0075 (US);
A61B5/208 (US);
A61B5/392 (US);
G01N33/4833 (EP);
G01N33/493 (EP);
A61B2562/0204 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/24] | Title | German: | BETTPFANNENANORDNUNG MIT AUSSCHEIDUNGSANALYSE | [2023/24] | English: | BED PAN ASSEMBLY WITH EXCRETION ANALYZATION | [2023/24] | French: | ENSEMBLE BASSIN HYGIÉNIQUE AVEC ANALYSE DES EXCRÉTIONS | [2023/24] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 06.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 03.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2011185489 (PARTINGTON GARRY [GB], et al); | [Y]WO2014047581 (MARSHALL MICHELLE [US], et al); | [Y]JP2014206002 (LIXIL CORP); | [XYA]US10022286 (MARSHALL MICHELLE [US]); | [Y]US10130293 (HIDAS GIL [AU]); | [Y]US10145787 (YAN SHUO-TING [TW]) |