EP4175654 - ANTISENSE OLIGONUCLEOTIDES TARGETING SARS-COV-2 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.04.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street 12th Floor Oakland CA 94607-5200 / US | For all designated states Aalborg University Fredrik Bajers Vej 7K Aalborg Øst 9220 Copenhagen / DK | [2023/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAAR, Anders, Michael Berkeley, California 94704 / US | 02 /
KAUPPINEN, Sakari 9220 Copenhagen / DK | 03 /
ZHU, Chi Berkeley, California 94704 / US | 04 /
KARSTENSEN, Kasper, Thystrup 9220 Copenhagen / DK | [2023/19] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Grünstraße 25 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | [2023/19] | Application number, filing date | 21853242.2 | 13.07.2021 | [2023/19] | WO2021US41503 | Priority number, date | US202063062417P | 06.08.2020 Original published format: US 202063062417 P | US202163147225P | 08.02.2021 Original published format: US 202163147225 P | [2023/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022031410 | Date: | 10.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4175654 | Date: | 10.05.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/76, A61K39/215, C07K16/10, C12N15/86 | [2023/19] | CPC: |
C12N15/1131 (EP,US);
A61K9/0043 (US);
A61P31/14 (US);
C12N2310/11 (EP,US);
C12N2310/315 (EP);
C12N2310/321 (US);
C12N2310/3231 (EP);
C12N2310/3233 (US);
C12N2310/341 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/19] | Title | German: | GEGEN SARS-COV-2 GERICHTETE ANTISENSE-OLIGONUKLEOTIDE | [2023/19] | English: | ANTISENSE OLIGONUCLEOTIDES TARGETING SARS-COV-2 | [2023/19] | French: | OLIGONUCLÉOTIDES ANTISENS CIBLANT LE SARS-COV-2 | [2023/19] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 06.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/19] | 18.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2006257852 (RAPPUOLI RINO [IT], et al) [X] 1-10, 19-20 * ; paragraphs [0405]-[0408], [1099], [1107], [1172], [1364], [1695] *; | [Y]US2007238681 (DOBIE KENNETH W [US], et al) [Y] 1-3, 6, 8/2-3, 8/6, 9/2-3,9/6, 10/2-3, 10/6, 19-24 * ; paragraphs [0015], [0018], [0082], [0094]-[0095], [0108] . *; | [Y] - MOITRA, P et al., "Selective Naked-Eye Detection of SARS-CoV 2 Mediated by N Gene Targeted Antisense Oligonucleotide Capped Plasmonic Nanoparticles", ACS Nano, (20200623), vol. 14, no. 6, doi:10.1021/acsnano.0c03822, pages 7617 - 7627, XP055796333 [Y] 1-10, 19-24 * . * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acsnano.0c03822 |