EP4193087 - SEALED PIPELINE CONNECTION, PIPELINE SLEEVE, AND LOCKABLE PIPELINE SEALS AND METHOD OF MAKING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LPS IP, LLC 8814 Industrial Lane Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730 / US | [2023/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE OLIVEIRA E SILVA, Jose, Anisio Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais / BR | 02 /
SEARS, Ryan, Michael Costa Mesa, CA 92627 / US | [2023/24] | Representative(s) | Bone, Alexander Marcus Thomas, et al AA Thornton IP LLP 8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/24] | Bone, Alexander Marcus Thomas, et al AA Thornton IP LLP Octagon Point 5 Cheapside London EC2V 6AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 21853323.0 | 04.08.2021 | [2023/24] | WO2021US44425 | Priority number, date | US202063061786P | 05.08.2020 Original published format: US 202063061786 P | [2023/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022031767 | Date: | 10.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4193087 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2024 | Classification | IPC: | F16L13/02, F16L21/02, F16L58/18, F16L17/02, F16L17/03, F16L21/00 | [2024/35] | CPC: |
F16L58/181 (EP);
F16L17/02 (US);
F16L13/0263 (EP);
F16L17/032 (EP);
F16L21/002 (EP);
F16L21/022 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/24] | F16L13/02, F16L21/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/24] | Title | German: | ABGEDICHTETE ROHRVERBINDUNG, ROHRLEITUNGSMUFFE UND VERRIEGELBARE ROHRLEITUNGSDICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2023/24] | English: | SEALED PIPELINE CONNECTION, PIPELINE SLEEVE, AND LOCKABLE PIPELINE SEALS AND METHOD OF MAKING SAME | [2023/24] | French: | RACCORD DE CANALISATION ÉTANCHE, MANCHON DE CANALISATION, ET JOINTS D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ DE CANALISATION VERROUILLABLES ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ASSOCIÉ | [2023/24] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 20.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3537731 (REDDY ROBERT R); | [A]US3955834 (AHLROT AKE); | [A]US4182519 (WILSON RALPH [AU]); | [A]EP0275055 (WIIK & HOEGLUND [DE]); | [X]US4768278 (PICKERING LEN [CA], et al); | [A]EP0389462 (RANNILA PAAVO OY [FI]); | [XI]WO9014544 (STIFAB PLAAT AB [SE]); | [X]US5104152 (GALFANT FREDERICK S [CA]); | [X]US6322111 (BRADY LARRY V [US]); | [A]US6739632 (THOMAS BRADLEY L [US], et al) | International search | [A]US3537731 (REDDY ROBERT R); | [A]US3955834 (AHLROT AKE); | [A]US4182519 (WILSON RALPH [AU]); | [Y]EP0275055 (WIIK & HOEGLUND [DE]); | [Y]US4768278 (PICKERING LEN [CA], et al); | [A]EP0389462 (RANNILA PAAVO OY [FI]); | [XY]WO9014544 (STIFAB PLAAT AB [SE]); | [XY]US5104152 (GALFANT FREDERICK S [CA]); | [A]US6739632 (THOMAS BRADLEY L [US], et al) |