EP4194330 - UNDERWATER CLEANING ROBOT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deepinfar Ocean Technology Inc. Building 7 Jinbin Development Industrial Park 45 Muning Road TEDA Tianjin 300457 / CN | [2023/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEI, Jiancang Tianjin 300457 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Yongqiang Tianjin 300457 / CN | 03 /
CHEN, Chao Tianjin 300457 / CN | 04 /
XIE, Cuifang Tianjin 300457 / CN | [2023/24] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon 4a rue de l'Industrie 67450 Mundolsheim / FR | [2023/24] | Application number, filing date | 21853590.4 | 06.08.2021 | [2023/24] | WO2021CN111338 | Priority number, date | CN202010781941 | 06.08.2020 Original published format: CN202010781941 | [2023/24] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022028611 | Date: | 10.02.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4194330 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 10.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B63B59/08, B63B59/10, B25J5/00, B08B3/02, B25J11/00 | [2024/39] | CPC: |
B63B59/08 (EP,CN);
B08B3/02 (CN,US);
B25J11/0085 (EP,US);
B08B13/00 (CN);
B08B3/024 (EP);
B25J11/00 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2023/24] | B63B59/08, B63B59/10, B25J5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/24] | Title | German: | UNTERWASSERREINIGUNGSROBOTERSYSTEM | [2023/24] | English: | UNDERWATER CLEANING ROBOT SYSTEM | [2023/24] | French: | ROBOT DE NETTOYAGE SOUS-MARIN | [2023/24] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2023 | Translation filed | 06.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 06.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |