EP4194725 - VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 04.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eagle Industry Co., Ltd. 1-12-15, Shiba-Daimon Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8587 / JP | [2023/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANZAKI, Toshinori Tokyo 105-8587 / JP | 02 /
TAKAHASHI, Wataru Tokyo 105-8587 / JP | 03 /
HAYAMA, Masahiro Tokyo 105-8587 / JP | 04 /
FUKUDOME, Kohei Tokyo 105-8587 / JP | 05 /
SHIRAFUJI, Keigo Tokyo 105-8587 / JP | [2023/24] | Representative(s) | WSL Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 98 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | [2023/24] | Application number, filing date | 21853892.4 | 27.07.2021 | [2023/24] | WO2021JP27769 | Priority number, date | JP20200132386 | 04.08.2020 Original published format: JP 2020132386 | [2023/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022030313 | Date: | 10.02.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4194725 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | F04B27/18, F16K1/42, F16K1/54, F16K31/06 | [2024/17] | CPC: |
F04B27/1804 (EP);
F04B27/18 (KR);
F16K1/36 (KR,US);
F16K1/42 (EP,KR,US);
F16K1/54 (EP);
F16K27/02 (KR);
F16K31/0655 (EP);
F04B2027/1809 (KR);
F04B2027/1813 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/24] | F16K1/36, F16K1/42, F04B27/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/24] | Title | German: | VENTIL | [2023/24] | English: | VALVE | [2023/24] | French: | SOUPAPE | [2023/24] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2023 | Translation filed | 31.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 31.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/24] | 04.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP3258103 (TGK CO LTD [JP]); | [A]JP2018135954 (FUJI KOKI KK); | [XI]JP2019167982 (FUJI KOKI KK) | International search | [A]JPH08159320 (FUJI KOKI MFG) [A] 1-7 * , entire text, all drawings *; | [A]JP2003314745 (SMC CORP) [A] 1-7* , entire text, all drawings *; | [A]JP2017180525 (FUJI KOKI KK) [A] 1-7 * , entire text, all drawings *; | [A]JP2018135954 (FUJI KOKI KK) [A] 1-7 * , entire text, all drawings *; | [X]JP2019167982 (FUJI KOKI KK) [X] 1-7 * , fig. 1, 4, paragraph [0063] * | by applicant | JP2015075054 |