EP4187932 - METHOD FOR PROVIDING LOCATION CONFIRMATION SERVICE FOR ELECTRONIC DEVICE, AND DEVICE THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.04.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Lyesuk Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Junghoon Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
JUNG, Hyosung Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 04 /
SONG, Gajin Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/22] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2023/22] | Application number, filing date | 21854309.8 | 26.07.2021 | [2023/22] | WO2021KR09669 | Priority number, date | KR20200097670 | 04.08.2020 Original published format: KR 20200097670 | [2023/22] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022030845 | Date: | 10.02.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4187932 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/02, H04W4/80, H04W4/06, H04W88/06, H04L9/40, H04W4/029, H04W48/16, H04W64/00 | [2024/03] | CPC: |
H04W48/16 (EP);
H04W4/023 (KR);
H04W4/029 (EP,US);
H04L63/0442 (EP);
H04W4/025 (EP);
H04W4/06 (KR);
H04W4/80 (EP,KR,US);
H04W64/00 (EP);
H04W8/005 (US);
H04W8/22 (US);
H04W88/06 (EP,KR);
H04W12/03 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/22] | H04W4/02, H04W4/80, H04W4/06, H04W88/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/22] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINES STANDORTBESTÄTIGUNGSDIENSTES FÜR EINE ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | [2023/22] | English: | METHOD FOR PROVIDING LOCATION CONFIRMATION SERVICE FOR ELECTRONIC DEVICE, AND DEVICE THEREFOR | [2023/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DESTINÉ À LA FOURNITURE D'UN SERVICE DE CONFIRMATION DE LOCALISATION POUR DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE, ET DISPOSITIF ASSOCIÉ | [2023/22] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2023 | Translation filed | 23.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 23.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/22] | 14.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2014087196 (NOKIA CORP [FI]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * claims 1,2,9 *; | [XI]US2017041868 (PALIN ARTO [FI], et al) [X] 12 * abstract * * figure 7 * * paragraph [0185] * * figure 9A * * paragraph [0215] - paragraph [0218] * * claims 1-3,7 *[I] 13-15 | International search | [A]KR100943830B (ELECTRONICS AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS RESEARCH INSTITUTE) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0039]-[0071]; and figures 4-9. *; | [A]KR20130017990 (UNIV DONG A RES FOUNDATION [KR]) [A] 1-15* See paragraphs [0037]-[0083]; and figures 1-9. *; | [A]US2014247821 (YAMADA KENJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0030]-[0112]; and figures 1-13. *; | [A]KR20160057413 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0020]-[0111]; and figures 1a-15. *; | [XA]US2017041868 (PALIN ARTO [FI], et al) [X] 12-15 * See paragraphs [0128] and [0215]-[0218]; and figure 9A. * [A] 1-11 |