EP4194711 - POWER TRANSMISSION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha F.C.C. 7000-36 Nakagawa Hosoe-cho Kita-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 431-1394 / JP | [2023/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OZAWA, Yoshihiko Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 431-1304 / JP | 02 /
CHEN, Han Hiong Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 431-1304 / JP | 03 /
YOSHIMOTO, Katsu Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 431-1304 / JP | [2023/24] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2023/24] | Application number, filing date | 21854390.8 | 29.07.2021 | [2023/24] | WO2021JP28049 | Priority number, date | JP20200134038 | 06.08.2020 Original published format: JP 2020134038 | [2023/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022030349 | Date: | 10.02.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4194711 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | F16D13/72, F16D13/74, F16D13/64, F16D13/56, F16D23/12 | [2024/17] | CPC: |
F16D13/648 (EP);
F16D13/74 (EP,US);
F16D13/56 (US);
F16D13/72 (EP);
F16D2013/565 (EP,US);
F16D2023/123 (EP);
F16D2300/06 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/24] | F16D13/60, F16D13/72, F16D13/74 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/24] | Title | German: | KRAFTÜBERTRAGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2023/24] | English: | POWER TRANSMISSION DEVICE | [2023/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION DE PUISSANCE | [2023/24] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2023 | Translation filed | 01.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 01.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/24] | 19.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2011192699 (YAZAKI MASAYA [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2017172652 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [A]KR20180013303 (HYUNDAI WIA CORP [KR]); | [A]US2019257369 (TABINOKI YUKIHISA [JP]) | International search | [A]JPS5224684Y ; | [A]JPS5850231U ; | [A]US2008141806 (METZINGER MANUEL [DE], et al); | [A]JP2011163425 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [AX]JP2019143689 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2011163425 |