EP4144115 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ENHANCED RESUME PROTECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/13] |
Former [2023/10] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AGIWAL, Anil Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Soenghun Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/10] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2023/10] | Application number, filing date | 21854405.4 | 03.08.2021 | [2023/10] | WO2021KR10182 | Priority number, date | KR20200096916 | 03.08.2020 Original published format: KR 20200096916 | [2023/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022030972 | Date: | 10.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4144115 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/08, // H04W76/27 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
H04W74/0833 (EP,KR);
H04W76/19 (US);
H04W12/04 (KR);
H04W28/0278 (KR);
H04W72/1268 (KR,US);
H04W74/0841 (US);
|
Former IPC [2023/10] | H04W12/10, H04W12/04, H04W76/19, H04W76/11, H04W76/27 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/10] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR VERBESSERTEN WIEDERAUFNAHMESCHUTZ | [2023/10] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ENHANCED RESUME PROTECTION | [2023/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR PROTECTION DE REPRISE RENFORCÉE | [2023/10] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2022 | Search fee paid | 02.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/10] | 01.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2020137564 (LIU HUICHUN [CN], et al) [A] 3,6,7,10,13-15 * paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0083] - paragraph [0119] *; | [Y] - SAMSUNG, "Overall procedure for data transfer in inactive state", vol. RAN WG2, no. Reno, USA; 20161114 - 20161118, (20161113), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-168051, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20161113), XP051177750 [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [02.1] - paragraph [02.2]; figure 2b * | [Y] - ZTE, "Consideration on early data transmission in eFeMTC", vol. RAN WG2, no. Berlin, Germany; 20170821 - 20170825, (20170820), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1708380 CONSIDERATION ON EARLY DATA TRANSMISSION IN EFEMTC, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20170820), XP051318252 [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [2.3.3]; figure 6 * | [Y] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Data transmission in inactive state, option A vs. option B", vol. RAN WG2, no. Athens, Greece; 20170213 - 20170217, (20170220), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1702058, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_97/Docs/, (20170220), XP051237185 [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [2.1.3]; figure 3 * | [A] - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "UL early data transmission", vol. RAN WG2, no. Berlin, Germany; 20170821 - 20170825, (20170820), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1708239 UL EARLY DATA TRANSMISSION-EMTC, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20170820), XP051318141 [A] 1,4,8,11 * paragraph [4.2.2]; figure 5 * | International search | [A]KR20200028781 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0007]-[0021]; and claims 1-20 *; | [Y]US2020214043 (PARK SUNG JUN [KR], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0070]-[0084]; and claims 10-31 *; | [Y]CN111385071 (TELECOMMUNICATIONS TECH RES INST CO LTD) [Y] 4-7,11-15 * paragraphs [0004]-[0077]; and claims 1-38 *; | [Y] - Qualcomm Incorporated, Samsung, CATT, Huawei, Hisilicon, "shortResumeMAC-I calculation", 3GPP Draft; S3-201263, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France , (20200501), vol. SA WG3, no. Online Meeting ;20200511 - 20200515, XP051879902 [Y] 1-15 * section 6.8.2.1.3 * | [A] - "3 Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Security architecture and procedures for 5G system (Release 16)", 3GPP Standard; Technical Specification; 3GPP TS 33.501, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France , (20200710), vol. SA WG3, no. V16.3.0, pages 1 - 248, XP051924931 [A] 1-15 * section 6.8.2.1.3 * | by applicant | US2020137564 | - EFEMTC. HUAWE1 et al., "Data transmission in inactive state, option A vs. option B", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1702058, 3RD GENERATION |