|
22.07.2024 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2024 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.07.2024 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
17.07.2024 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.07.2024 |
Description |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
17.07.2024 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.07.2024 |
Summary of subsequently filed documents |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.07.2024 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.04.2024 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.04.2024 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.04.2024 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2024 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2023 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.12.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.12.2023 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
22.12.2023 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.08.2023 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.06.2023 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.06.2023 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.06.2023 |
Confirmation of effective date of early entry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2023 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
19.06.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.06.2023 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2023 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.06.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.06.2023 |
Declaration of eligibility for a reduction of fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.06.2023 |
Description |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
19.06.2023 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.06.2023 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.06.2023 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.04.2023 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.07.2022 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
45 |
|
16.06.2022 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.06.2022 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.06.2022 |
International publication pamphlet |
Search / examination |
48 |
|
10.05.2022 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
10.05.2022 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
10.05.2022 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
10.05.2022 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
10.05.2022 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
21.02.2022 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
04.02.2022 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
04.02.2022 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
04.02.2022 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
41 |
|
04.02.2022 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
04.02.2022 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
04.02.2022 |
Translated claims for ISA/EP |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
04.02.2022 |
Translated description for ISA/EP |
International Searching Authority |
40 |
|
04.02.2022 |
Translated drawings for ISA/EP |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
04.02.2022 |
Translation of the abstract for ISA/EP |
International Searching Authority |
1 |