Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024102197 | Global Dossier | 28.03.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20383069 | 09.12.2020 | WO2021ES70864 | 30.11.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20230118929 | Global Dossier | 14.08.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | EP20383069 | 09.12.2020 | WO2021ES70864 | 30.11.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2023553052 | Global Dossier | 20.12.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | EP20383069 | 09.12.2020 | WO2021ES70864 | 30.11.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL303496 | Global Dossier | 01.08.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | EP20383069 | 09.12.2020 | WO2021ES70864 | 30.11.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN116829769 | Global Dossier | 29.09.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | EP20383069 | 09.12.2020 | WO2021ES70864 | 30.11.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3201056 | Global Dossier | 16.06.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20383069 | 09.12.2020 | WO2021ES70864 | 30.11.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2021397840 | Global Dossier | 06.07.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20383069 | 09.12.2020 | WO2021ES70864 | 30.11.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4249647 | Global Dossier | 27.09.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20383069 | 09.12.2020 | WO2021ES70864 | 30.11.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2023006788 | 20.06.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | EP20383069 | 09.12.2020 | WO2021ES70864 | 30.11.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022123096 | Global Dossier | 16.06.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20383069 | 09.12.2020 |