EP4267722 - DIFFUSION GRADIENT ASSAY FOR ANTI-CD3-CONTAINING MOLECULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | 23.02.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amgen Inc. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks, CA 91320 / US | For all designated states Amgen Research (Munich) GmbH Staffelseestrasse 2 81477 München / DE | [2023/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAN, Glenn, Christopher Thousand Oaks, CA 91320-1799 / US | 02 /
ZASADZINSKA, Ewelina Thousand Oaks, CA 91320-1799 / US | 03 /
HOFFMANN, Patrick 81477 Munich / DE | 04 /
WU, Bin Thousand Oaks, CA 91320-1799 / US | [2023/44] | Representative(s) | Lau, Sarah Jane, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2023/44] | Application number, filing date | 21854953.3 | 21.12.2021 | [2023/44] | WO2021US64546 | Priority number, date | US202063128959P | 22.12.2020 Original published format: US 202063128959 P | [2023/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022140344 | Date: | 30.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4267722 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/00, B01L3/00, C12M1/00, G01N21/64 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
C12N5/0075 (EP,US);
C12M23/16 (US);
B01L2200/0668 (EP);
B01L2300/0896 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/44] | Title | German: | DIFFUSIONSGRADIENTTEST FÜR ANTI-CD3-HALTIGE MOLEKÜLE | [2023/44] | English: | DIFFUSION GRADIENT ASSAY FOR ANTI-CD3-CONTAINING MOLECULES | [2023/44] | French: | ESSAI PAR GRADIENT DE DIFFUSION POUR DES MOLÉCULES CONTENANT UN ANTI-CD3 | [2023/44] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/44] | 04.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2017117521 (BERKELEY LIGHTS INC [US], et al) [I] 1-24 * abstract * * pages 3-4, paragraph 6 * * page 21, paragraph 82 * * pages 61-62, paragraphs 202-205 * * pages 63-64, paragraphs 209,210 * * pages 82-84; examples 9,10 * * page 86; example 16 *; | [I]WO2018076024 (PARK MINHA [US], et al) [I] 1-24 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 5 ** page 18, paragraph 93 *; | [I]WO2018126205 (MARSON ALEX [US], et al) [I] 1-24 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 5 * * page 60, paragraph 204 * * pages 61-62, paragraph 208 * * pages 72-73, paragraph 238 * * page 74, paragraph 241 * * page 75, paragraph 243 * * page 78, paragraph 248 * * pages 90-91, paragraphs 291-294 *; | [I] - ZHANG WEIKAI ET AL, "A microfluidic chip for screening high-producing hybridomas at single cell level", LAB ON A CHIP, UK, vol. 20, no. 21, doi:10.1039/D0LC00847H, ISSN 1473-0197, (20201027), pages 4043 - 4051, URL: https://pubs.rsc.org/en/content/articlepdf/2020/lc/d0lc00847h, XP055915000 [I] 1-24 * abstract * * page 4044, column l, paragraph 3 * * page 4045, column r, paragraph l - page 4048, column l, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/D0LC00847H | by applicant | - WURM, F. M., Nat Biotechnol, (20040000), no. 11, pages 1393 - 8 | - FRYE, C. et al., Biologicals, (20160000), vol. 44, no. 2, pages 117 - 22 | - LE KTAN CLE H et al., "Assuring Clonality on the Beacon Digital Cell Line Development Platform", Biotechnol, (20200000), vol. 15, no. 1, doi:10.1002/biot.201900247, page 900247, XP055757553 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/biot.201900247 | - WURM, F. M., Nat Biotechnol. | - LE K et al., Biotechnol Prog., (20180000), vol. 34, no. 6, pages 1438 - 1446 | - LE K et al., Biotechnol J., (20200000), vol. 15, no. l, page el900247 | - BAEUERLE PA et al., Curr Opin Mol Ther, (20090000), vol. 11, no. 1, pages 22 - 30 | - FRANKEL SRBAEUERLE PA, Curr Opin Chem Biol., (20130000), vol. 17, no. 3, pages 385 - 392 | - YURASZECK T et al., Clin Pharmacol Ther., (20170000), vol. 101, no. 5, pages 634 - 645 | - BAEUERLE PA et al., Curr Opin Mol Ther., (20090000), vol. 11, no. 1, pages 22 - 30 | - LOVE et al., Nat. Biotechnol., (20060000), vol. 24, no. 6, page 703 | - OZKUMUR et al., Materials Views, (20150000), vol. 11, no. 36, pages 4643 - 4650 | - "UniProt", Database accession no. P07766 | - CLEVERS et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., (19880000), vol. 85, pages 8156 - 8160 | - BORROTO et al., J. Immunol., (19990000), vol. 163, no. 1, pages 25 - 31 | - SEIMETZ et al., Cancer Treat Rev, (20100000), vol. 36, no. 6, pages 458 - 67 | - "Downstream Processing of Fc Fusion Proteins, Bispecific Antibodies, and Antibody-Drug Conjugates", SHULKANORMAN, Process Scale Purification of, John Wiley & Sons, (20170000), pages 559 - 594 | - MOORE et al., MAbs, (20110000), vol. 3, no. 6, pages 546 - 557 | - COLOMA, M.J., Nature Biotech., (19970000), vol. 15, pages 159 - 163 | - LEHNINGE, Biochemistry, Worth Publishers, Inc., (19750000), pages 71 - 77 | - GRAHAM et al., J. Gen Virol, (19770000), vol. 36, page 59 | - Mather, Biol. Reprod., (19800000), vol. 23, pages 243 - 251 | - MATHER et al., Annals N.Y Acad. Sci., (19820000), vol. 383, pages 44 - 68 | - DESIGN, Berkeley Lights, vol. 1758 | - LE K et al., Biotechnol J, (20200000), vol. 15, no. l, page el900247 |