EP4155776 - BASE STATION DETERMINATION METHOD, APPARATUS AND DEVICE, AND COMPUTER STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | 06.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states China Mobile Shanghai ICT Co., Ltd Building 10. No 27 Xin Jinqiao Road Pudong New Area Shanghai 201206 / CN | For all designated states CM Intelligent Mobility Building 10 No 27 Xin Jinqiao Road Pudong New Area Shanghai 200120 / CN | For all designated states CHINA MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS GROUP CO., LTD. 29, Jinrong Ave. Xicheng District Beijing 100032 / CN | [2023/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TU, Kui Shanghai 201206 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Yuxin Shanghai 201206 / CN | 03 /
NI, Kaiyue Shanghai 201206 / CN | [2023/13] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2023/13] | Application number, filing date | 21855112.5 | 08.04.2021 | [2023/13] | WO2021CN85951 | Priority number, date | CN202010819525 | 14.08.2020 Original published format: CN202010819525 | [2023/13] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022033056 | Date: | 17.02.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4155776 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 17.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01S19/07, G01S19/43, H04W64/00, // G01S19/41 | [2024/03] | CPC: |
H04W64/003 (EP,CN,US);
H04W16/18 (CN);
G01S19/073 (EP);
H04B7/18517 (CN);
G01S19/41 (EP);
G01S2205/01 (EP);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/13] | G01S19/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/13] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINER BASISSTATION UND COMPUTERSPEICHERMEDIUM | [2023/13] | English: | BASE STATION DETERMINATION METHOD, APPARATUS AND DEVICE, AND COMPUTER STORAGE MEDIUM | [2023/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL ET DISPOSITIF DE DÉTERMINATION DE STATION DE BASE ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE INFORMATIQUE | [2023/13] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2022 | Translation filed | 22.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2022 | Search fee paid | 22.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/13] | 12.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2019124618 (XIONG YOUJUN [CN], et al) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [A]US2020025937 (KROEGER BRIAN [US], et al) [A] 1-10* entire document *; | [A]CN110907971 (ALLYSTAR TECH SHENZHEN CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [A] - Mei Qi, "Research on Differential Satellite Positioning Technology and System Based on Multiple Base Stations", China Master’s Theses Full-text Database, (20181231), XP055900068 [A] 1-10 * section 4.3.2 * |