EP4160897 - BIDIRECTIONAL DC-DC CONVERTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [2023/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOUDHURY, Abhijit Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 02 /
KANOUDA, Akihiko Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [2023/14] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2023/14] | Application number, filing date | 21855807.0 | 02.06.2021 | [2023/14] | WO2021JP21074 | Priority number, date | JP20200136815 | 13.08.2020 Original published format: JP 2020136815 | [2023/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022034728 | Date: | 17.02.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4160897 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/28, H02M3/335, H02M3/00 | [2024/28] | CPC: |
H02M3/01 (EP,US);
H02M3/33584 (EP,US);
H02M1/32 (EP);
H02M3/003 (EP);
H02M3/33573 (EP,US);
H02M3/33576 (EP);
H02M1/0064 (EP);
H02M3/015 (EP);
H02M3/33571 (EP);
Y02B70/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/14] | H02M3/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] | Title | German: | BIDIREKTIONALER GLEICHSTROM-GLEICHSTROM-WANDLER | [2023/14] | English: | BIDIRECTIONAL DC-DC CONVERTER | [2023/14] | French: | CONVERTISSEUR CC-CC BIDIRECTIONNEL | [2023/14] | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.2022 | Translation filed | 30.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 30.12.2022 | Search fee paid | 30.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2015381064 (MATSUBARA KUNIO [JP], et al); | [XYI]WO2018149295 (NIO CO LTD [CN]); | [Y]CN110868074 (GOODWE JIANGSU POWER SUPPLY TECH CO LTD) | International search | [A]JP2012070491 (PANASONIC CORP); | [A]JP2014079108 (TDK CORP); | [A]WO2015004989 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]); | [A]WO2017134232 (ELTEK AS [NO]) |