Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022416286 | Global Dossier | 29.12.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021KR10362 | 05.08.2021 | KR20200100691 | 11.08.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7313552B | Global Dossier | 24.07.2023 | B2 | JP2022553651 | 26.12.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2021KR10362 | 05.08.2021 | KR20200100691 | 11.08.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114586230 | Global Dossier | 03.06.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2021KR10362 | 05.08.2021 | KR20200100691 | 11.08.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4075566 | Global Dossier | 03.07.2024 | A4 | EP4075566 | 19.10.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021KR10362 | 05.08.2021 | KR20200100691 | 11.08.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022035133 | Global Dossier | 17.02.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20200100691 | 11.08.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20220020123 | Global Dossier | 18.02.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20200100691 | 11.08.2020 |