EP4195464 - BALANCE WEIGHT FOR ELECTRIC COMPRESSOR MOTOR AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Song, Yeong Guk 103-1002, 7-27, Aenigol-gil Ilsandong-gu Goyang-si Gyeonggi-do 10301 / KR | [2023/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2023/24] | Representative(s) | Stöckeler, Ferdinand, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2023/24] | Application number, filing date | 21856181.9 | 10.08.2021 | [2023/24] | WO2021KR10549 | Priority number, date | KR20200099748 | 10.08.2020 Original published format: KR 20200099748 | [2023/24] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022035175 | Date: | 17.02.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4195464 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H02K7/04, H02K7/02, F04B17/03, C22C9/04, C22C38/12, B22F3/12, B22F5/00, B22F1/05, B22F3/16, C22C1/04 | [2024/37] | CPC: |
H02K7/04 (EP,KR,US);
B22F1/05 (EP);
B22F3/12 (KR);
B22F3/16 (EP,US);
B22F3/164 (EP);
B22F3/24 (US);
B22F5/00 (KR);
C22C1/0425 (EP);
C22C38/12 (EP,KR);
C22C9/04 (KR,US);
F04B17/03 (EP,KR);
F25B31/026 (US);
H02K15/165 (US);
H02K7/02 (KR);
B22F2301/10 (US);
B22F2301/20 (US);
B22F2301/35 (US);
B22F2304/10 (US);
B22F2998/10 (EP);
B22F2999/00 (EP);
Y02E60/16 (EP);
Y02T10/64 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/10, B22F3/02, B22F3/16 (EP);
B22F2999/00, B22F3/10, B22F2201/013 (EP) |
Former IPC [2023/24] | H02K7/04, H02K7/02, F04B17/03, C22C9/04, C22C38/12, B22F3/12, B22F5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/24] | Title | German: | AUSGLEICHSGEWICHT FÜR EINEN ELEKTRISCHEN KOMPRESSORMOTOR UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2023/24] | English: | BALANCE WEIGHT FOR ELECTRIC COMPRESSOR MOTOR AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR | [2023/24] | French: | POIDS D'ÉQUILIBRE POUR MOTEUR DE COMPRESSEUR ÉLECTRIQUE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2023/24] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2023 | Translation filed | 09.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 09.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2001012554 (NKK SEIMITSU KK, et al); | [A]KR100710641B ; | [XYI]CN103691955 (SHU SIXIONG); | [XYI]CN103834847 (UNIV SOUTH CHINA TECH); | [A]KR20160081781 (HAN DEOK HWAN [KR]); | [XYI]CN106544570 (UNIV SOUTH CHINA TECH); | [Y]CN109128137 (ZHEJIANG BAIDA PREC MANUFACTURING CORP) | International search | [Y]JP2001012554 (NKK SEIMITSU KK, et al); | [A]JP2001041290 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP, et al); | [XY]KR20070040691 (DAEWOO ELECTRONICS CORP [KR]); | [A]US2012301299 (SHERRILL PAUL B [US], et al); | [Y]KR20160081781 (HAN DEOK HWAN [KR]) | by applicant | KR20050017849 |