EP4179835 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR MANAGEMENT OF ROUTING INFORMATION AND SESSION CONTROL FOR UNMANNED AERIAL SYSTEM (UAS) COMMUNICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.04.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Jungshin Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
HAN, Yoonseon Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
MOON, Sangjun Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/20] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2023/20] | Application number, filing date | 21856193.4 | 10.08.2021 | [2023/20] | WO2021KR10580 | Priority number, date | KR20200101270 | 12.08.2020 Original published format: KR 20200101270 | [2023/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022035187 | Date: | 17.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4179835 | Date: | 17.05.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/11, H04W12/088, H04W4/40, H04W28/24, H04W80/10 | [2023/20] | CPC: |
H04B7/18506 (EP,US);
H04W76/11 (EP,KR,US);
G08G5/0013 (EP);
G08G5/0026 (EP);
G08G5/006 (EP);
G08G5/0069 (EP);
H04W12/088 (KR);
H04W28/24 (KR);
H04W4/40 (KR);
H04W40/02 (EP,US);
H04W60/00 (US);
H04W80/10 (KR);
H04W88/14 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/20] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWALTUNG VON ROUTING-INFORMATIONEN UND SITZUNGSSTEUERUNG FÜR EINE KOMMUNIKATION MIT UNBEMANNTEM ANTENNENSYSTEM (UAS) | [2023/20] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR MANAGEMENT OF ROUTING INFORMATION AND SESSION CONTROL FOR UNMANNED AERIAL SYSTEM (UAS) COMMUNICATION | [2023/20] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION D'INFORMATIONS DE ROUTAGE ET DE COMMANDE DE SESSION PERMETTANT UNE COMMUNICATION D'UN SYSTÈME AÉRIEN SANS PILOTE (UAS) | [2023/20] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 09.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/20] | 02.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Study on supporting Unmanned Aerial Systems (UAS) connectivity, Identification and tracking (Release 17)", (20200702), 3GPP DRAFT; 23754-020, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_sa/WG2_Arch/Latest_SA2_Specs/Latest_draft_S2_Specs/23754-020.zip, (20200702), XP051906662 [X] 1,4,5,7-9,13,15 * page 26, line 6.5 - page 32 * * figures 6.5.3-1 * [A] 2,3,6,10-12,14 | [A] - TOMASZEWSKI LECHOSLAW ET AL, "On 5G Support of Cross-Border UAV Operations", 2020 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS WORKSHOPS (ICC WORKSHOPS), IEEE, (20200607), doi:10.1109/ICCWORKSHOPS49005.2020.9145262, pages 1 - 6, XP033796195 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICCWorkshops49005.2020.9145262 | International search | [A]WO2019153863 (CHINA ACADEMY TELECOMMUNICATIONS TECHNOLOGY [CN]) [A] 1-15 * claim 1; and figure 1 *; | [A]US2020045517 (PARK YONGSOO [KR]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0113]-[0128]; and figure 5 *; | [A]WO2020033905 (INTEL CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0026]-[0037]; and figure 1 *; | [A]KR20200087838 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-2 *; | [X] - Qualcomm Incorporated, Futurewei, AT&T, Motorola Mobility, Lenovo, Interdigital, Verizon, Huawei, HiSilicon, "KI#1, KI#2, KI#3, KI#7, New Sol: Solution for UAV authentication and authorization by USS/UTM", 3GPP Draft; S2-2004672, (20200612), vol. SA WG2, pages 1 - 11, XP051898971 [X] 1-15 * pages 1, 3, 6-7 * | by applicant | - QUALCOMM INCORPORATEDFUTUREWEIAT&TMOTOROLA MOBILITYLENOVOINTERDIGITALVERIZONHUAWEIHISILICON, "Kl#l, Kl#2, Kl#3, Kl#7, New Sol: Solution for UAV authentication and authorization by USS/UTM", 3GPP Draft; S2-2004672, (20200612), vol. SA WG2, pages 1 - 11 |